This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/23/2023 at 10:01:55 (UTC).

Armstrong v. Wudue

Case Summary

On 07/15/2022 Armstrong filed an Other lawsuit against Wudue. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Feng, Samuel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5634

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Feng, Samuel

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Oliver Armstrong

Respondents and Defendants

Shumet Wudue

Big Dog City Corporation, dba Yellow Cab of San Francisco

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Bryan D. Lamb

Richard Leonard Frischer

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Cynthia Elaine Tobisman

Aaron C. Hancock

Laura Grace Lim

Brian C. Johnson

James E. Sell

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Change of contact information filed for:; Notes: Aaron C. Hancock old firm: Bishop Barry, APC new firm: Mokri Vanis & Jones LLP old address 1: 6001 Shellmound Street, Suite 875 new address 1: 3620 American River Drive, Suite 218 old city: Emeryville new city: Sacramento old zip: 94608 new zip: 95864

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Greines Martin, attorneys for respondent Wudue: counsel request argument not be set for April 28, May 26, June 18-July 20, and August 20-27, 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: attorney Cynthia Tobisman for respondent; remote appearance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: Richard Frischer, attorney for appellant Armstrong; via remote appeearance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Oral argument waiver notice sent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Proof of service of reply brief on superior court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Oliver Armstrong Attorney: Richard Leonard Frischer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Oliver ArmstrongAttorney: Richard Leonard Frischer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: Appellant's reply brief. Due on 03/06/2023 By 62 Day(s) see Stipulation filed Sept. 12, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:; Notes: appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Oliver Armstrong Attorney: Richard Leonard Frischer Copy of judgment and notice of entry attached

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Oliver ArmstrongAttorney: Richard Leonard Frischer; Notes: Copy of judgment and notice of entry attached

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: R-1(e-filed)(attached to designation) **Entire Record Electronic**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 07/26/2022. Designating 8.124 with RT(attached).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Note:; Notes: Filing fee paid directly to Superior Court. Payment to be forwarded by JCC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 07/15/2022 by Counsel for Plaintiff Oliver Armstrong appealing judgment from 07/05/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; County: San Francisco; Trial Court Case Number: CGC19576657; Trial Court Judge: Feng, Samuel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less