This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/10/2022 at 18:00:42 (UTC).

Arizmendi v. The Superior Court of Sacramento County

Case Summary

On 05/31/2022 Arizmendi filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of Sacramento County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Winn, John. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6320

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Winn, John

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Javier Frank Arizmendi

Respondent

The Superior Court of Sacramento County

Interested Parties

The People

District Attorney of Sacramento County

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

David J. Cohen

Attorney at Bay Area Criminal Lawyers, PC

300 Montgomery Street, Suite 660

San Francisco, CA 94104

Jason Thomas Campbell

Attorney at Bay Area Criminal Lawyers, PC

300 Montgomery Street, Suite 660

San Francisco, CA 94104

Interested Party Attorneys

Office of the State Attorney General

P.O. Box 944255

Sacramento, CA 94244-2550

Bruce Bingwei Chang

Attorney at Office of the Sacramento County District Attorney

901 G Street

Sacramento, CA 95814-1801

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: Mauro, Acing P.J., Krause, J., Earl, J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Petition. Supplemental exhibit G (35 pp.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Petition. 1 vol. (135 pp.).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed declaration of:; Notes: Attorney David J. Cohen in support of petition.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: mandate or prohibition.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Sacramento County Superior Court; County: Sacramento; Trial Court Case Number: 19FE018184; Trial Court Judge: Winn, John

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Office of the District Attorney of Sacramento County is a litigant

Latest cases where The Superior Court of Sacramento County is a litigant

Latest cases where People is a litigant