This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/24/2022 at 00:34:29 (UTC).

Ari Investment Cases

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 Ari Investment Cases was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Wilson, Peter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0440

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Wilson, Peter

 

Party Details

Respondents, Plaintiffs and Appellants

Lorelei Mooney

ARI-DFW East & West 9, LP

Gary Lamm

James Mieuli

Argus Realty Investors, LP

ARI Financial Services, Inc.

Argus Realty, LLC

ARI Commercial Properties, Inc.

Richard Gee

Maxwell B. Drever

Timothy E. Snodgrass

William Brian Candler

ARI-DFW, East & West, LP

ARI-Barrett Office Center, LLC

ARI-Atrium Office Building, LLC

ARI-Powers Ferry Office Park, LLC

ARI-Copley Business Center, LLC

ARI-Shoreview Corporate Center, LLC

ARI-Securities Centre One & Two, LLC

ARI-Meridian Plaza, LLC

Defendants, Respondents and Appellants

Argus Realty Investors, LP

ARI Financial Services, Inc.

Argus Realty, LLC

ARI Commercial Properties, Inc.

Richard Gee

Maxwell B. Drever

Timothy E. Snodgrass

William Brian Candler

ARI-DFW, East & West, LP

ARI-Barrett Office Center, LLC

ARI-Atrium Office Building, LLC

ARI-Powers Ferry Office Park, LLC

ARI-Copley Business Center, LLC

ARI-Shoreview Corporate Center, LLC

ARI-Securities Centre One & Two, LLC

ARI-Meridian Plaza, LLC

20 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent, Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

Kenneth J. Catanzarite

Attorney at Catanzarite Law Corporation

2331 W Lincoln Ave

Anaheim, CA 92801

Philip Charles Tencer

Attorney at TencerSherman, LLP

12520 High Bluff Dr Ste 230

San Diego, CA 92130

Respondent, Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Philip Charles Tencer

Attorney at TencerSherman, LLP

12520 High Bluff Dr Ste 230

San Diego, CA 92130

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2022
  • HearingDescription: Appeal dismissed for failure to file opening brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.; Notes: If appellants opening brief and appendix are not filed within 15 days after the date of this notice, the appeal may be dismissed. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.220(a)(1).) No additional notices under rule 8.220 will be issued, even if further extensions are granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Due on 05/18/2022 By 21 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Due on 04/27/2022 By 30 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Voluntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Partial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.; Notes: As to Plaintiffs, Appellants, and Cross-Respondents Lorelei Mooney, ARI-DFW East & West 9, L.P., Gary Lamm, and James Mieuli

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed pursuant to:; Notes: On February 14, 2022, Plaintiffs, Appellants, and Cross-Respondents Lorelei Mooney, ARI-DFW East & West 9, L.P., Gary Lamm, and James Mieuli (Plaintiffs) filed a request to dismiss the appeal they filed on June 30, 2021. The appeal filed by Plaintiffs is DISMISSED. The clerk of this court is DIRECTED to issue forthwith a partial remittitur as to Plaintiffs' appeal only. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.244(c).) Defendants, Respondents, and Cross-Appellants Argus Realty Investors, L.P., ARI Financial Services, Inc., Argus Realty, LLC, ARI Commercial Properties, Inc., Richard Gee, Maxwell B. Drever, Timothy E. Snodgrass, William Brian Candler, ARI-DFW, East & West, L.P., ARI-Barrett Office Center, LLC, ARI-Atrium Office Building, LLC, ARI-Powers Ferry Office Park, LLC, ARI Copley Business Center, LLC, ARI-Shoreview Corporate Center, LLC, ARI-Securities Centre One & Two, LLC, and ARI-Meridian Plaza, LLC (Defendants) filed a cross-appeal on July 28, 2021. The appeal filed by Defendants shall remain in full force and effect. The briefing schedule ordered by this court on October 6, 2021, is VACATED. Defendants shall file an appellant's appendix and opening brief within 40 days of the filing of this order and the parties' remaining briefing shall be filed in accordance with California Rules of Court, rule 8.212(a).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for dismissal filed.; Notes: By APLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.; Notes: If appellants opening brief and appendix for Lorelei Mooney, ARI-DFW East & West 9, L.P., Gary Lamm, and James Mieuli is not filed within 15 days after the date of this notice, the appeal may be dismissed. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.220(a)(1).) No additional notices under rule 8.220 will be issued, even if further extensions are granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: NOTICE TO REPORTER TO STOP PREPARATION OF REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: CSR: M. Cooper

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Filed on 7-22-21. Proceeding by 8.124 w/RT. Aplts: Lorelei Mooney et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: For x-appeal.By x-aplts Argus Realty Investors, L.P.Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: X-appeal By x-aplts Argus Realty Investors, L.P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Paid by APLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Aplts: Lorelei Mooney et al.Also appealing date 6-3-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Main; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: JCCP 4811; Trial Court Judge: Wilson, Peter

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARI COMMERCIAL PROPERTIES, INC. is a litigant