This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/20/2023 at 02:02:52 (UTC).

Archuleta v. McGraw et al.

Case Summary

On 09/30/2022 Archuleta filed an Other lawsuit against McGraw. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 7 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Bowick, Stephanie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3930

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Bowick, Stephanie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Hannah Archuleta

Respondents and Defendants

Dr. Phillip McGraw

Peteski Productions, Inc.

CBS Television Distribution

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

Marcus John Spiegel

Gloria R. Allred

Olivia Flechsig

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Katherine Marie Harwood

William C. Haggerty

Neil S. Tardiff

Charles L. Babcock

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Voluntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final The court has read and considered appellant's request for dismissal of appeal, filed May 1, 2023. Good cause appearing therefor, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the appeal filed September 30, 2022, is dismissed. The clerk is directed to issue the remittitur forthwith.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered appellant's request for dismissal of appeal, filed May 1, 2023. Good cause appearing therefor, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the appeal filed September 30, 2022, is dismissed. The clerk is directed to issue the remittitur forthwith.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketDescription: Request for dismissal filed.; Notes: Appellant's Request for Dismissal of Appeal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketDescription: pro hac vice granted; Notes: The court has read and considered attorney Charles L. Babcock's March 21, 2023 application for admission pro hac vice for respondents Phillip C. McGraw, CBS Television Distribution, and Peteski Productions, Inc. Good cause appearing therefor, IT IS ORDERED that the application is granted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketDescription: pro hac vice application; Notes: Attorney Charles L. Babcock for respondents.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: ELEVEN: Clerks (3165 Pages), TWO: reporters.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated Oct. 13, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: This Court has received appellant's notice of appeal. The case has been assigned the above referenced number. Any counsel who are not licensed to practice in the State of California and intend to appear in or file any documents with this Court must first file an application to appear pro hac vice pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 9.40(c)(2). This application must be made to this Court regardless of any previous order granting pro hac vice appearance filed in the trial court. A new application to appear as counsel pro hac vice made to this Court must conform to California Rules of Court, Rule 8.54. Pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 9.40(e), payment of the required fee is to be made to California State Bar and a statement regarding payment must be indicated in the application to this Court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: notice of association of counsel filed by respondents - Neil Tardiff will be co-counsel for respondents.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Hannah Archuleta Attorney: Gloria R. Allred Attorney: Marcus John Spiegel Attorney: Olivia Flechsig

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Hannah ArchuletaAttorney: Gloria R. Allred Attorney: Marcus John Spiegel Attorney: Olivia Flechsig

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check #61129 for $775.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed on September 30, 2022 by Hannah Archuleta.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 21STCV38489; Trial Court Judge: Bowick, Stephanie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less