***9368
08/18/2021
Pending - Other Pending
Other
Statewide, California
Villarreal, Lydia
AquaLegacy Development, LLC
2012 Canrow Owner, LLC
Medallion Servicing, LLC
Aaron Robert Gruber
Dylan James Crosby
Sean David Unger
David James Bowie
Court documents are not available for this case.
HearingDescription: Remittitur issued.
[-] Read LessDispositionDescription: Reversed in Full; Disposition Type: Final In H049160, AquaLegacy v. Canrow, the March 21, 2021 judgment is reversed and the matter is remanded to the trial court for the limited purpose of allowing Canrow, upon appropriate motion or other appropriate procedure, to obtain an order for 36 reformation of the trustee's deed recorded November 19, 2014, to correct the error identifying Medallion Silver, LLC as the trustee. In H048978, Ruby Falls v. AquaLegacy, the March 21, 2021 judgment is reversed. In H049062, AquaLegacy v. Canrow, the March 21, 2021 judgment is affirmed. In H049368, AquaLegacy v. Canrow, the August 12, 2021 order awarding attorney fees to AquaLegacy is reversed. (MJG, AMG, CCL); Publication Status: Signed Unpublished; Author: Greenwood, Mary J.; Participants: Grover, Adrienne M. (Concur) Lie, Cynthia C. (Concur)
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: (Signed Unpublished) In H049160, AquaLegacy v. Canrow, the March 21, 2021 judgment is reversed and the matter is remanded to the trial court for the limited purpose of allowing Canrow, upon appropriate motion or other appropriate procedure, to obtain an order for 36 reformation of the trustee's deed recorded November 19, 2014, to correct the error identifying Medallion Silver, LLC as the trustee. In H048978, Ruby Falls v. AquaLegacy, the March 21, 2021 judgment is reversed. In H049062, AquaLegacy v. Canrow, the March 21, 2021 judgment is affirmed. In H049368, AquaLegacy v. Canrow, the August 12, 2021 order awarding attorney fees to AquaLegacy is reversed. (MJG, AMG, CCL)
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Cause argued and submitted.
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Counsel David Bowie in case Nos. H049062, H049160, H049368 is changing from personal appearance to remote appearance.
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Oral argument rescheduled; Notes: On the court's own motion, oral argument in the above-entitled cause originally scheduled for Thursday, January 5, 2023, is rescheduled to Thursday, February 16, 2023, at 1:30 p.m. Courtroom entrance will be restricted to counsel and self-represented litigants presenting in-person oral argument only. Counsel and self-represented litigants appearing in person must wear masks and may remove them when addressing the Court during their oral argument. Court staff will be masked, and the Justices will be masked as appropriate during oral argument. Parties who have opted to appear remotely will receive detailed information on how to participate through the BlueJeans Video Conferencing platform.
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Received:
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Calendar notice sent electronically. Calendar date:; Notes: Oral argument in the above-entitled cause will be heard on Thursday, January 5, 2023, at 9:30 a.m. Courtroom entrance will be restricted to counsel and self-represented litigants presenting in-person oral argument only. Counsel and self-represented litigants appearing in person must wear masks and may remove them when addressing the Court during their oral argument. Court staff will be masked, and the Justices will be masked as appropriate during oral argument. Parties who have opted to appear remotely will receive detailed information on how to participate through the BlueJeans Video Conferencing platform.
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: David Bowie for appellants 2012 Canrow Owner, LLC and Medallion Servicing, LLC (15 minutes - personal appearance).
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: Sean D. Unger for respondent (10 minutes - personal appearance).
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Mail returned.; Notes: ACE attorney service check returned as left blank and unclear what it is intended for.
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: We have received a copy of the notice of election to proceed under the provisions of rule 8.124 of the California Rules of Court. The appellant having filed notice of intent to proceed without a reporter's transcript on appeal, the appellant's opening brief and appendix shall be served and filed within 70 days from the date of filing the notice of election under rule 8.124 with the trial court (rule 8.212(a)(1)(B) of the California Rules of Court).
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Proceeding by 8.124 - no reporter's transcript.; Notes: Filed 09/02/21
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Received copy of; Notes: Preliminary opposition to writ petitions by AquaLegacy Development LLC
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: On the court's own motion, appeal number H049368 is hereby ordered to be considered together with appeal numbers H048978, H049062, and H049160 (see order filed July 22, 2021 in each of these dockets) for purposes of oral argument and briefing.
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Filing fee received from:; Notes: Appellant
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: 2012 Canrow Owner, LLV, a California Limited Liability, Company, Filed 8/18/21
[-] Read LessDocketTrial Court Name: Monterey County Superior Court; County: Monterey; Trial Court Case Number: 16CV001078; Trial Court Judge: Villarreal, Lydia
[-] Read Less