This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/15/2023 at 08:00:56 (UTC).

AquaLegacy Development, LLC v. 2012 Canrow Owner, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/03/2021 AquaLegacy Development, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against 2012 Canrow Owner, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Villarreal, Lydia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2645

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Villarreal, Lydia

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

AquaLegacy Development, LLC

Defendant and Respondent

2012 Canrow Owner, LLC

Other

Ruby Falls Fund, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Kenneth Paul Nabity

Dylan James Crosby

Hannah L. Jones

Sean David Unger

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

William Daniel Coffee

David J. Bowie

Other Attorneys

Caroline Brooke Patterson

Janet Elizabeth Humphrey

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Case transferred out of district; Disposition Type: Final The following matters, now pending in the Court of Appeal, Second Appellate District, are transferred to the Court of Appeal, Sixth Appellate District.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Supreme Court order filed transferring case.; Notes: The following matters, now pending in the Court of Appeal, Second Appellate District, are transferred to the Court of Appeal, Sixth Appellate District.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: Supreme Court requesting transfer of this case to the Sixth Appellate District.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Response filed:; Notes: David J. Bowie, counsel for respondent requests oral argument;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Response filed:; Notes: Sean D. Unger, counsel for appellant requests oral argument

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Substitution of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Dylan J. Crosby substitutes in for Aaron R. Gruber as counsel for AquaLegacy Development, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Substitution of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Notice of appearance of Sean D. Unger of Paul Hastings LLP on behalf of Appellant and Respondent AquaLegacy Development LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case start date.; Notes: based on the filing of the transfer order;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.; Notes: case fully briefed 6/8/22 in Sixth Appellate District; [8/9/22 date reflects the date the case was transferred to the Second District Court of Appeal]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: AquaLegacy Development LLC, Plaintiff and Appellant Jonathan R. Bass, Retained counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Association of attorneys filed for: Aaron R. Gruber of Ralls Gruber & Niece LLP hereby appears on behalf of Appellant and Respondent AquaLegacy Development LLCAssociation of attorneys filed for: Dylan J. Crosby of Ralls Gruber & Niece LLP hereby appears on behalf of Appellant and Respondent AquaLegacy Development LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: RT-6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: On the court's own motion, appeal number H049368 is hereby ordered to be considered together with appeal numbers H048978, H049062, and H049160 (see order filed July 22, 2021 in each of these dockets) for purposes of oral argument and briefing.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: On the court's own motion, appeal numbers H048978, H049062, and H049160 are hereby ordered considered together for purposes of oral argument and disposition. Filed in lead case H048978

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Atty. Jonathan Bass (3/4/21 jmt; 3/4/21 pos; 5/3/21 noa)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Atty. Jonathan Bass (3/4/21 jmt; 3/4/21 pos; 5/3/21 noa)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: filed 4/28/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: AquaLegacy Development LLC; filed 5/3/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Monterey County Superior Court; County: Monterey; Trial Court Case Number: 16CV001078; Trial Court Judge: Villarreal, Lydia

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less