This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 11/29/2023 at 17:07:21 (UTC).

A.Q. v. The Superior Court; CFS

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 A Q filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court CFS. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mapes, Steven. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0496

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Mapes, Steven

 

Party Details

Petitioner

A. Q.

Respondent

The Superior Court of San Bernardino County

Interested Party

San Bernardino County Children and Family Services

Not Yet Classified

M. B.

Y. B.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Gloria Sook KimChung

Interested Party Attorney

Office Of The County Counsel

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Grace Gail Cara Esse

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

01/31/2023

DispositionDescription: Order dismissing petition; Disposition Type: Final

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2023

DocketDescription: Case complete.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2023

DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: No issue statement filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2023

DocketDescription: No Issue Statement Filed by Counsel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2023

DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: Record filed on this date. Writ petition due within 10 days.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2023

DocketDescription: Juvenile writ record filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2023

DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1 (64 pgs)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2023

DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: C-1 (353 pgs)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023

DocketDescription: Received copy of; Notes: Minute order dtd Jan 12, 2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023

DocketDescription: Received copy of; Notes: Minute orders dtd Jan 12, 2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023

DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Dtd Jan 12, 2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023

DocketDescription: Received notice of intent.; Notes: Dtd Jan 12, 2023; A.Q. (mother)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketTrial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: J294026; Trial Court Judge: Mapes, Steven

[+] Read More [-] Read Less