This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 11/12/2021 at 06:43:46 (UTC).

ANTELOPE VALLEY GROUNDWATER CASES

Case Summary

On 05/14/2021 ANTELOPE VALLEY GROUNDWATER CASES was filed as an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8802

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

David Estrada

Respondents, Defendants and Not Yet Classified

Palmdate Water District

Desert Lake Comminity Services District

Littlerock Creek Irrigation District

Los Angeles County Waterworks District No. 40

Noreth Edwards Water District

Big Rock Mutual Water Company

California Water Service Company

Rosamond Community Services District

Llano Del Rio Water Company

City of Los Angeles

Los Angeles County Sanitation Districts Nos. 14 and 20

Diamond Farming Company

Radcast Investments, Inc.

Bolthouse Properties, LLC

Crystal Organic Farms

Tejon Ranch Company

Wm. Bolthouse Farms

Granite Construction Company

Grimmway Enterprises, Inc.

Respondents and Cross Defendants

Los Angeles County Sanitation Districts Nos. 14 and 20

Diamond Farming Company

Radcast Investments, Inc.

Bolthouse Properties, LLC

Crystal Organic Farms

Tejon Ranch Company

Wm. Bolthouse Farms

Granite Construction Company

Grimmway Enterprises, Inc.

City of Los Angeles

58 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

Gregory Edwin Wolff

Attorney at California Appellate Law Group LLP

96 Jessie Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Gregory L. James

Attorney at Attorney at Law

1839 Shoshone Drive

Bishop, CA 93514

Victoria Elena Fuller

Attorney at Niddrie Addams Fuller Singh LLP

600 W Broadway Ste 1200

San Diego, CA 92101-3314

Ralph B. Kalfayan

Attorney at The Kalfayan Law Firm, APC

2262 Carmel Valley Road, Suite 200

Del Mar, CA 92014

Respondent, Not Yet Classified and Defendant Attorneys

Wayne Keith Lemieux

Attorney at Olivarez Madruga Lemieux O'Neill, LLP

4165 E. Thousand Oaks Blvd., Suite 350

Westlake Village, CA 91362

Warren Robert Wellen

Attorney at Office of the County Counsel

500 West Temple Street

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Eric Lynn Garner

Attorney at Best Best & Krieger LLP

300 S Grand Ave Fl 25

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3169

Timothy Towery Coates

Attorney at Greines Martin et al LLP

5900 Wilshire Blvd 12 Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Jeffrey Vincent Dunn

Attorney at Best Best & Krieger LLP

18101 Von Karman Ave, Suite 1000

Irvine, CA 92612

Lynne Patrice McGhee

Attorney at California Water Services Company

1720 First Street

San Jose, CA 95113

Joseph Ante Brajevich

Attorney at Los Angeles City Attorney's Office

221 N. Figueroa St Ste 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Raymond Stanley Ilgunas

Attorney at Ofc City Attorney/LAWA

1 World Way # 104

Los Angeles, CA 90045-5803

Julie Conboy Riley

Attorney at Los Angeles City Attorney's Office

Department Of Water & Power 221 M. Figueroa Street, Suite 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Eric Nelson Robinson

Attorney at Kronick, Moskovitz, Tiedemann & Girard

1331 Garden Highway, 2Nd Floor

Sacramento, CA 95833

Andrew K Sheffield

Attorney at LeBeau & Thelen LLP

5001 E. Cornrnercenter Drive, Suite 300

Bakersfield, CA 93309

Robert G. Kuhs

Attorney at LEBEAU THELEN, LLP

P.O. Box 12092 5001 East Commercenter Dr., Ste. 300

Bakersfield, CA 93389-2092

Richard G. Zimmer

Attorney at ZIMMER & MELTON, LLP

11601 Bolthouse Drive, Suite 100

Bakersfield, CA 93311-8714

Respondent and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Andrew K Sheffield

Attorney at LeBeau & Thelen LLP

5001 E. Cornrnercenter Drive, Suite 300

Bakersfield, CA 93309

Robert G. Kuhs

Attorney at LEBEAU THELEN, LLP

P.O. Box 12092 5001 East Commercenter Dr., Ste. 300

Bakersfield, CA 93389-2092

Richard G. Zimmer

Attorney at ZIMMER & MELTON, LLP

11601 Bolthouse Drive, Suite 100

Bakersfield, CA 93311-8714

Joseph Ante Brajevich

Attorney at Los Angeles City Attorney's Office

221 N. Figueroa St Ste 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Raymond Stanley Ilgunas

Attorney at Ofc City Attorney/LAWA

1 World Way # 104

Los Angeles, CA 90045-5803

Julie Conboy Riley

Attorney at Los Angeles City Attorney's Office

Department Of Water & Power 221 M. Figueroa Street, Suite 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Eric Nelson Robinson

Attorney at Kronick, Moskovitz, Tiedemann & Girard

1331 Garden Highway, 2Nd Floor

Sacramento, CA 95833

Other Attorneys

James L. Markman

Attorney at Richards, Watson & Gershom

350 S. Grand Avenue, 37Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

William Milligan Sloan

Attorney at Venable LLP

101 California Street, Suite 3800

San Francisco, CA 94111

John L Smeltzer

Attorney at United States Department of Justice - Environmental and Natural Resources Division

Appellate Section P.O. Box 7415

Washington, DC 20044

12 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Note: Mail returned and re-sent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied; Notes: The request for judicial notice is denied. The petition for review is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Time extended to grant or deny review; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including August 12, 2021, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: David Estrada Attorney: Veneeta Jaswal OPPOSITION TO PUBLIC WATER SUPPLIERS' REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reply to answer to petition filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: David Estrada Attorney: Gregory Edwin Wolff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Motion for judicial notice filed; Notes: Defendant, Cross-complainant and Respondent: Palmdate Water District Attorney: Thomas S. Bunn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant, Cross-complainant and Respondent: Palmdate Water District Attorney: Thomas S. Bunn ** 2nd answer **

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant, Cross-defendant and Respondent: City of Los Angeles Attorney: Eric N. Robinson Cross-defendant, Cross-complainant and Respondent: Antelope Valley-East Kern Water Agency Attorney: James L. Markman Cross-defendant and Respondent: U.S. Borax Inc. Attorney: William Milligan Sloan Cross-defendant and Respondent: Tejon Ranchcorp Attorney: Robert G. Kuhs Cross-defendant and Respondent: Los Angeles County Sanitation Districts Nos. 14 and 20 Attorney: Christopher Michael Sanders Cross-defendant and Respondent: Wm. Bolthouse Farms Attorney: Richard G. Zimmer Cross-defendant and Respondent: Diamond Farming Company Attorney: Robert G. Kuhs Cross-defendant and Respondent: Tejon Ranch Company Attorney: Robert G. Kuhs Cross-defendant and Respondent: Granite Construction Company Attorney: Robert G. Kuhs Cross-defendant and Respondent: Bolthouse Properties, LLC Attorney: Richard G. Zimmer Cross-defendant and Respondent: Crystal Organic Farms Attorney: Robert G. Kuhs Cross-defendant and Respondent: Grimmway Enterprises, Inc. Attorney: Robert G. Kuhs Cross-defendant and Respondent: Lapis Land Company, LLC Attorney: Robert G. Kuhs Defendant, Cross-defendant and Respondent: Los Angeles World Airports Attorney: Eric N. Robinson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: David Estrada Attorney: Gregory Edwin Wolff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Diamond Farming Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Littlerock Creek Irrigation District is a litigant

Latest cases where NORTH EDWARDS WATER DISTRICT is a litigant