This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/22/2023 at 02:05:08 (UTC).

Andrade et al. v. Norman S. Wright Climatec Mechanical et al.

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 Andrade filed an Other lawsuit against Norman S Wright Climatec Mechanical. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Borenstein, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6625

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Borenstein, Mark

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Hortencia Andrade

Salvador Andrade

Respondents and Defendants

Norman S. Wright Climatec Mechanical

Luis A Tapia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Arash Homampour

Jason Salinas Halpern

Benjamin Israel Siminou

Ronan J. Duggan

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Jay D. Brown

Michael Gunter Rix

Rex S. Heinke

Ruth D. Kahn

Daniel R. Friedenthal

Jessica Michael Weisel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2023
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated Jan. 23, 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Hortencia Andrade Attorney: Benjamin Israel Siminou Plaintiff and Appellant: Salvador Andrade Attorney: Benjamin Israel Siminou

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Hortencia AndradeAttorney: Benjamin Israel Siminou Plaintiff and Appellant: Salvador AndradeAttorney: Benjamin Israel Siminou

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $775 filing fee paid.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed on January 12, 2023 by Hortencia Andrade and Salvador Andrade.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 19STCV10659; Trial Court Judge: Borenstein, Mark

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less