This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 09/21/2022 at 02:14:30 (UTC).

ANDERSON v. PIH HEALTH HOSPITAL - WHITTIER

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 ANDERSON filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against PIH HEALTH HOSPITAL - WHITTIER. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4648

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Mary Andrenetta Anderson

Respondent and Defendant

PIH Health Hospital - Whittier

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Alaba Ajetunmobi

Attorney at Law Offices of Alaba Ajetunmobi

100 Oceangate, 12Th Floor

Long Beach, CA 90802

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Scott Darrow Buchholz

Attorney at Dummit Buchholz & Trapp

101 West Broadway, Suite 1400

San Diego, CA 92101

Pari Naz Granum

Attorney at Dummit, Buchholz & Trapp

101 West Broadway, Suite 1400

San Diego, CA 92101-8286

Nicholas D. Smith

Attorney at Dummit Buchholz & Trapp

101 West Broadway, Suite 1400

San Diego, CA 92101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Mary Andrenetta Anderson Attorney: Alaba Ajetunmobi ** Filed with permission **

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: ** Received timely petition for review, missing bookmarks. contacted the counsel for appellant, ask to resubmit ASAP deem timely. **

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 2; Court of Appeal Case Number: B308407; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: BC715361

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRESBYTERIAN INTERCOMMUNITY HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicholas D. Smith

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BUCHHOLZ SCOTT D.