This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 07/15/2023 at 13:37:36 (UTC).

Anderson v. City and County of San Francisco

Case Summary

On 02/14/2023 Anderson filed an Other lawsuit against City and County of San Francisco. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7230

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Appellant

Rob Anderson

Respondent

City and County of San Francisco

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Appellant Attorney

Mary Ann Miles

Respondent Attorney

James Moxon Emery

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court; Disposition Type: Final (filed in superior court on 5/8/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 4/20/2023; Amended CT w/RT (attached to designation filed on 3/22/23)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Declaration of Mary Miles on Designation of Record on Appeal filed 03/22/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 03/22/2023. Designating CT with RT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order waiving filing fee.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Petitioner and Appellant: Rob Anderson Attorney: Mary Ann Miles Mary Miles, attorney for Appellant, with copy of Order attached

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Petitioner and Appellant: Rob AndersonAttorney: Mary Ann Miles; Notes: Mary Miles, attorney for Appellant, with copy of Order attached

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketDescription: Default notice received-appellant notified per rule 8.140(a)(1).; Notes: Co. Clerk Default re Designation; filed 3/7/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 02/14/2023 by Counsel for Petitioner Rob Anderson appealing order from 12/14/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; County: San Francisco; Trial Court Case Number: CPF05505509

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less