This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 12/04/2022 at 22:02:59 (UTC).

ANABI OIL v. IFUEL (HALAKA)

Case Summary

On 04/15/2022 ANABI OIL filed an Other lawsuit against IFUEL HALAKA. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3514

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

Anabi Oil Corporation

IFuel, Inc.

Artashes Yepremyan

S & J

Appellants and Defendants

IFuel, Inc.

Artashes Yepremyan

S & J

Evon Halaka

Defendant and Respondent

Evon Halaka

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

Kevin Kanooni

Kenneth P. Roberts

Plaintiff, Appellant and Respondent Attorneys

Kevin Kanooni

Kenneth P. Roberts

Robert A. Kashfian

Ryan Daniel Kashfian

Andrew M. Stein

Appellant, Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Robert A. Kashfian

Ryan Daniel Kashfian

Andrew M. Stein

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

06/01/2022

DispositionDescription: Publication request denied

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2022

DocketDescription: Publication request denied (case closed)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/15/2022

DocketDescription: Case start date (publication request)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2022

DocketDescription: Request for publication filed (initial case entry); Notes: Defendant and Appellant: IFuel, Inc. Attorney: Ryan Daniel Kashfian Defendant and Appellant: Artashes Yepremyan Attorney: Ryan Daniel Kashfian Per March 4, 2022 Court of Appeal order: The request for publication of the opinion has been considered and is denied for the reason that the court does not find said opinion meets the standard for publication as set forth in rule 8.1105 of the California Rules of Court.(A second Opinion was filed on February 24, 2022 after an OSC was issued in the Court of Appeal.)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2021

DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 4; Court of Appeal Case Number: B301899; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: 19NWCV00160; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: VC066237

[+] Read More [-] Read Less