This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 12/23/2021 at 14:06:59 (UTC).

Amirian v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Case Summary

On 10/27/2021 Amirian filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Burdge, Jr., Richard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5943

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Burdge, Jr., Richard

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Joseph W. Amirian

Respondent

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Interested Party

Everloving Home Health, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Dariush Ghaffar Adli

Attorney at Adli Law Group PC

12400 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 1460

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Jacob Isaac Mojarro

Attorney at Adli Law Group, P.C.

12400 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 1460

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorney

Steven C. Gambardella

Attorney at Law Offices of Steven C. Gambardella

28632 Roadside Drive Suite 200

Agoura Hills, CA 91301-4006

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final This matter having been transferred from the Supreme Court to this Court via order dated October 27, 2021, and this Court having determined that the within petition is substantially the same as petition No. B313572, considered and denied on September 2, 2021, the within petition is hereby denied. (Hagan v. Superior Court (1962) 57 Cal.2d 767, 769-770.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: This matter having been transferred from the Supreme Court to this Court via order dated October 27, 2021, and this Court having determined that the within petition is substantially the same as petition No. B313572, considered and denied on September 2, 2021, the within petition is hereby denied. (Hagan v. Superior Court (1962) 57 Cal.2d 767, 769-770.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Supreme Court order filed transferring case in.; Notes: The above-entitled matter is transferred to the Court of Appeal, Second Appellate District.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate.STAY REQUESTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EVERLOVING HOME HEALTH INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant