This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 03/04/2021 at 14:07:00 (UTC).

AMERICAN CHEMISTRY COUNCIL v. OFFICE OF ENVIRONMENTAL HEALTH HAZARD ASSESSMENT

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 AMERICAN CHEMISTRY COUNCIL filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against OFFICE OF ENVIRONMENTAL HEALTH HAZARD ASSESSMENT. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3931

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

American Chemistry Council

Respondents and Defendants

Dr. George Alexeeff

Office of Environmental Health Hazard Assessment

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Theodore Joseph Boutrous

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Robert Edward Dunn

Attorney at Eimer Stahl LLP

99 South Almaden Boulevard, Suite 662

San Jose, CA 95113

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

Harrison M. Pollak

Attorney at Office of the State Attorney General

P.O. Box 70550 1515 Clay Street, 20Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94612-0500

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: 1 doghouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: One doghouse.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: American Chemistry Council Attorney: Robert Edward Dunn **Based on the order granting publication filed on July 8, 2020**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Third Appellate District; Court of Appeal Case Number: C079260; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Sacramento County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: 34201480001868CUWMGDS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Office of Environmental Health Hazard Assessment is a litigant

Latest cases where American Chemistry Council is a litigant