This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/16/2023 at 20:04:54 (UTC).

Amanda St. John v. Riverside County Public Guardian

Case Summary

On 04/19/2022 Amanda St John filed an Other lawsuit against Riverside County Public Guardian. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Jackson, Jacqueline. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8878

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Jackson, Jacqueline

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Amanda St. John

Respondent and Defendant

Riverside County Public Guardian

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

Stacy Cameron Keffer

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

07/29/2022

DocketDescription: Case complete.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/29/2022

DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/27/2022

DispositionDescription: Dismissed per rule 8.140(b); Disposition Type: Final

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/27/2022

DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed per rule 8.140(b).; Notes: Failure to timely designate record on appeal.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/20/2022

DocketDescription: To presiding justice for signature.; Notes: Proposed dismissal order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/20/2022

DocketDescription: Default notice received-appellant notified per rule 8.140(a)(1).; Notes: Failure to timely designate the record on appeal

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/20/2022

DocketDescription: Received default notice 8.121(a) designation not filed. Dated:; Notes: May 2, 2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2022

DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2022

DocketDescription: Order waiving filing fee.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2022

DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2022

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: dtd Apr 19, 2022; Amanda St. John

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/18/2022

DocketTrial Court Name: Riverside County Superior Court; County: Riverside; Trial Court Case Number: RIP1600087; Trial Court Judge: Jackson, Jacqueline

[+] Read More [-] Read Less