This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/07/2023 at 00:19:10 (UTC).

Alomatsi v. Deanco Healthcare LLC ** MATTER STAYED**

Case Summary

On 04/12/2022 Alomatsi filed an Other lawsuit against Deanco Healthcare LLC MATTER STAYED. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0866

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

David Alomatsi

Los Angeles, CA 90027

Respondent and Defendant

Deanco Healthcare LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

Kevin L. Metros

Attorney at Reback, McAndrews, Blessey, LLP

1230 Rosecrans Avenue Suite 450

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2023
  • HearingDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Other involuntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: On April 12, 2022, declared vexatious plaintiff David Alomatsi filed in propria persona a notice of appeal from a judgment entered on February 10, 2022 after the entry of an order granting a summary judgment motion. As a declared vexatious plaintiff, Alomatsi was required to obtain leave of the administrative presiding justice of this court before filing his notice of appeal in propria persona (Code Civ. Proc., 391.7, subd. (a)), which he failed to do. On June 9, 2022, the clerk of this court sent notice to Alomatsi requesting him to demonstrate in writing within 10 days of the date of the notice that his appeal has merit and was not filed for purposes of harassment or delay. (Code Civ. Proc., 391.7, subds. (b)-(c).) [...] The court declines to issue a prefiling order allowing the appeal to proceed. (Code Civ. Proc., 391.7, subds. (b)-(c).) Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 391.7, subdivision (c), the appeal initiated by the notice filed on April 12, 2022 is dismissed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Appellant's request to extend the time within to file the response to the notice re vexatious litigant is granted. The time to file the response is extended by 7 days.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Appellant's request for extension of time to court's notice dated June 9, 2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice re vexatious litigant (CCP 391.7) - Matter stayed.; Notes: NOTICE TO PARTIES Pursuant to section 391.7, subdivision (c) of the Code of Civil Procedure, all proceedings are hereby stayed. It has come to the attention of the Court that David Alomatsi has previously been found to be a vexatious litigant within the meaning of Code of Civil Procedure section 391.7, subdivision (a). Within 10 days of the date of this notice Alomatsi shall show in writing "that the litigation has merit and has not been taken for purposes of harassment or delay." (Code Civ. Proc., sec. 391.7, subd. (b)). If Alomatsi fails to respond to this notice in a timely manner, or if the response fails to demonstrate the merit of the action herein, the appeal shall be dismissed. (Andrisani v. Hoodack (1992) 9 Cal.App.4th 279, 281.)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed Apr 12, 2022 by David Alomatsi

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 19STCV21741

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEANCO HEALTHCARE LLC A CALIFORNIA... is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer METROS KEVIN LEE