This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 10/02/2021 at 21:51:32 (UTC).

ALI v. AUTO NATION (MITCHEM)

Case Summary

On 08/20/2021 ALI filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against AUTO NATION MITCHEM. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0489

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondents and Plaintiffs

Ghandi Ali

Auto Nation, Inc.

An Luxury Imports of San Diego, Inc.

Allison Bavarian

AN F. Imports of Roseville, Inc.

An Fremont Luxury Imports, Inc.

An Imports of Stevens Creek, Inc.

An San Jose Luxury Imports, Inc.

An Valen Cia Auto Imports, Inc.

An Western Region Management, LLC

Auto Car, Inc.

Auto Company XIX, Inc.

Auto Company Any XXII, Inc.

Auto Comp Any XXIII, Inc.

Auto Delearship VII, LLC

An Texas Region Management, LTD.

Auto Mission LTD.

Autonation.com, Inc.

Appellants and Not Yet Classified

Devonte Mitchem

Niki Phuong Ngo

Respondents and Defendants

Auto Nation, Inc.

An Luxury Imports of San Diego, Inc.

Allison Bavarian

AN F. Imports of Roseville, Inc.

An Fremont Luxury Imports, Inc.

An Imports of Stevens Creek, Inc.

An San Jose Luxury Imports, Inc.

An Valen Cia Auto Imports, Inc.

An Western Region Management, LLC

Auto Car, Inc.

Auto Company XIX, Inc.

Auto Company Any XXII, Inc.

Auto Comp Any XXIII, Inc.

Auto Delearship VII, LLC

An Texas Region Management, LTD.

Auto Mission LTD.

Autonation.com, Inc.

80 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Craig Justin Ackermann

Attorney at Ackermann & Tilajef PC

1180 South Beverly Drive, Suite 610

Los Angeles, CA 90035

Sam Vahedi

Attorney at Attorney at Law

1180 South Beverly Drive, Suite 610

Los Angeles, CA 90035

David Samuel Winston

Attorney at Winston Law Group, P.C.

1180 South Beverly Drive, Suite 610

Los Angeles, CA 90035-1158

Jonathan Melmed

Attorney at Melmed Law Group P.C.

1180 South Beverly Drive, Suite 610

Los Angeles, CA 90035

Christopher Charles Hoffman

Attorney at Fisher & Phillips LLP

4747 Executive Drive, Suite 1000

San Diego, CA 92121

Megan Emily Walker

Attorney at Fisher & Phillips LLP

4747 Executive Drive, Suite 1000

San Diego, CA 92121-3113

Appellant and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Kayvon Sabourian

Attorney at Matern Law Group

1230 Rosecrans Avenue, Suite 200

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266-2497

Debra Janet Tauger

Attorney at Matern Law Group, PC

1230 Rosecrans Avenue Suite 200

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

Matthew John Matern

Attorney at Matern Law Group, PC

1230 Rosecrans Avenue, Suite 200

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

Launa Nicole Adolph

Attorney at Matern Law Group, PC

1230 Rosecrans Avenue, Suite 200

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266-2497

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Christopher Charles Hoffman

Attorney at Fisher & Phillips LLP

4747 Executive Drive, Suite 1000

San Diego, CA 92121

Megan Emily Walker

Attorney at Fisher & Phillips LLP

4747 Executive Drive, Suite 1000

San Diego, CA 92121-3113

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Time extended to grant or deny review; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including November 18, 2021, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reply to answer to petition filed; Notes: Movant and Appellant: Devonte Mitchem Attorney: Debra Janet Tauger Movant and Appellant: Niki Phuong Ngo Attorney: Debra Janet Tauger

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: Ghandi Ali Attorney: Sam Vahedi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record electronically imported.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Motion for judicial notice filed; Notes: Movant and Appellant: Devonte Mitchem Attorney: Debra Janet Tauger Movant and Appellant: Niki Phuong Ngo Attorney: Debra Janet Tauger

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Movant and Appellant: Devonte Mitchem Attorney: Debra Janet Tauger Movant and Appellant: Niki Phuong Ngo Attorney: Debra Janet Tauger

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Fourth Appellate District, Division One; Court of Appeal Case Number: D077323; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: 37-2018-00037616-CU-OE-CTL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Auto Car, Inc. is a litigant