This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/02/2023 at 15:40:35 (UTC).

Alfonso v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 02/22/2023 Alfonso filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Hunter, Eleanor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6556

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Hunter, Eleanor

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Jason Alfonso

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Hon. Eleanor J. Hunter

Interested Party

The People

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Daniel Ritkes

Respondent Attorneys

Court Counsel

Presiding Judge

Interested Party Attorneys

Office of the District Attorney

Office of the Attorney General

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final The petition for writ of prohibition filed on February 21, 2023 has been read and considered and is denied on the ground petitioner has not demonstrated entitlement to extraordinary relief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The petition for writ of prohibition filed on February 21, 2023 has been read and considered and is denied on the ground petitioner has not demonstrated entitlement to extraordinary relief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Amended exhibits in support of pettiion for prohibition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Amended exhibits in support of petition for prohibition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Amended exhibits in support of pettiion for prohibition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received letter from:; Notes: Law Offices of Daniel Ritkes dated February 22, 2023 re: I am writing to you because your clerk suggested I write to you to describe the problems I have been having trying to properly file the exhibits to my petition.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Petitioner's attorney regarding noncompliance on bookmarks, cover pages, and pagination for exhibits.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: 8 volumes of exhibits.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less