This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/25/2023 at 04:25:09 (UTC).

Alers et al. v. Kossuth et al.

Case Summary

On 08/05/2022 Alers filed an Other lawsuit against Kossuth. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tanaka, Gary. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2634

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Tanaka, Gary

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

Hazel Alers

Alejandro Alers, Jr

Defendants and Respondents

Olympia Medical Center

Windsor Terrace Healthcare Center SNF

Seasons Hospice & Palliative Care

Pejman Naghdechi

Tom Carmody

Gary Zimny

Arman Ahangarzadeh

Phillip Rohrbacher

Sara Kossuth

Ronald Lang, M.D.

Healthcare Partners Affiliates Medical Group

Mary Jean Lockard

N. Isabel Kiefer, M.D.

Kelly Winer

Hagop Sarkissian, M.D.

Not Yet Classified

Estate of Alejandro Alers, Sr.

17 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Laura Gabriela Lopez

Deborah S. Tropp

David P. Pruett

Darryl Craig Hottinger

Paul David Singer

Sita Joanna Dyriam

Denise H. Greer

David John Masutani

Alysia Brittani Carroll

Brenda Ligorsky

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2023
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • HearingDescription: Case on ready list; no reply by respondent to notice re failure to file brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • HearingDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: re Motion to dismiss filed by respondent Ronald Lang, M.D.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketDescription: Motion to dismiss filed (after record).; Notes: Respondent Ronald Lang, M.D.'s motion to dismiss appeal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Case on ready list; no reply by respondent to notice re failure to file brief. Due on 06/09/2023 By 31 Day(s) [ The Court: the extension of the default period is granted pursuant to CRC 8.220 (d). Any request for a further extension of time is disfavored. ]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Respondent Ronald Lang, M.D. motion for relief from default filed May 5, 2023, is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Hazel Alers Pro Per Plaintiff and Appellant: Alejandro Alers, Jr Pro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Hazel AlersPro Per Plaintiff and Appellant: Alejandro Alers, JrPro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: The civil case information statement submitted on 9/14/2022 has been rejected because the judgment/order appealed was not attached.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Respondent Olympia Healthcare, LLC associates David P. Pruett of the law firm Carroll, Kelly, Trotter & Franzen as co-counsel of record.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Order of dismissal submitted on September 08, 2022 returned for rejected civil case information statement that accompanied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Civil case information statement submitted on September 08, 2022 returned for failure to serve appropriate parties, for failure to demonstrate with a Proof of Service that appropriate parties have been served and for failure to fully complete Part III Party and Attorney Information page. The list should include the name of each party, the party's attorney if they are not self-represented, and the attorney's street address, e-mail address, telephone number, and State Bar number.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $775 filing fee paid.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed on August 05, 2022 by Hazel Alers and Alejandro Alers, Jr.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 20STCV36943; Trial Court Judge: Tanaka, Gary

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less