This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 12/06/2022 at 04:33:17 (UTC).

ALBRECHT v. COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE (DESERT WATER AGENCY)

Case Summary

On 10/13/2021 ALBRECHT filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE DESERT WATER AGENCY. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0984

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Leonard Albrecht

Patricia Abbey

Patricia L. Abbey

William Adler

Pam Adler

Ainge Brindamour

Tognalli Trust

Daniel Alegre

Aubrey Dean Jenkins Trust

Jody Basile

Henry Basile

Gregory B.

Susan Baten

Joel Edward Bonner III Trust

Defendants and Respondents

County of Riverside

Desert Water Agency

Coachella Valley Water District

Palm Springs Unified School District

Palo Verde School District

Desert Community College District

Respondents and Intervenors

Desert Water Agency

Coachella Valley Water District

Palm Springs Unified School District

Palo Verde School District

Desert Community College District

800 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Jane E. Maschka

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Gregory Priamos

Ronak N. Patel

Roderick Walston

Miles B. Krieger

Pamela K. Graham

Michael G. Colantuono

Liliane M. Wyckoff

Respondent and Intervenor Attorneys

Roderick Walston

Miles B. Krieger

Pamela K. Graham

Michael G. Colantuono

Liliane M. Wyckoff

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: 1 doghouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Time extended to grant or deny review; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including January 11, 2022, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reply to answer to petition filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Leonard Albrecht Attorney: Jane E. Maschka Plaintiff and Appellant: Patricia Abbey Attorney: Jane E. Maschka

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: 1 doghouse.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Joinder to answer filed; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: County of Riverside Attorney: Ronak N. Patel Intervener and Respondent: Desert Water Agency Attorney: Miles B. Krieger Attorney: Roderick Walston Intervener and Respondent: Coachella Valley Water District Attorney: Michael G. Colantuono Attorney: Pamela K. Graham

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Appellate record imported and available in electronic format.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case start: Petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Leonard Albrecht Attorney: Jane E. Maschka Plaintiff and Appellant: Patricia Abbey Attorney: Jane E. Maschka

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received premature petition for review; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Leonard Albrecht Attorney: Jane E. Maschka Plaintiff and Appellant: Patricia Abbey Attorney: Jane E. Maschka

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Fourth Appellate District, Division Two; Court of Appeal Case Number: E073926; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Riverside County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: PSC1501100; Trial Court: Riverside County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: RIC1719093

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less