This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 10/14/2023 at 02:16:05 (UTC).

ALBRECHT v. COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE (DESERT WATER AGENCY)

Case Summary

On 10/13/2021 ALBRECHT filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE DESERT WATER AGENCY. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0984

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Leonard Albrecht

Patricia Abbey

Patricia L. Abbey

William Adler

Pam Adler

Ainge Brindamour

Tognalli Trust

Daniel Alegre

Aubrey Dean Jenkins Trust

Jody Basile

Henry Basile

Gregory B.

Susan Baten

Joel Edward Bonner III Trust

Respondents and Defendants

County of Riverside

Desert Water Agency

Coachella Valley Water District

Palm Springs Unified School District

Palo Verde School District

Desert Community College District

Intervenors and Respondents

Desert Water Agency

Coachella Valley Water District

Palm Springs Unified School District

Palo Verde School District

Desert Community College District

800 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Jane E. Maschka

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Gregory Priamos

Ronak N. Patel

Roderick Walston

Miles B. Krieger

Pamela K. Graham

Liliane M. Wyckoff

Michael G. Colantuono

Respondent and Intervenor Attorneys

Roderick Walston

Miles B. Krieger

Pamela K. Graham

Liliane M. Wyckoff

Michael G. Colantuono

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

12/27/2021

DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: 1 doghouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2021

DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2021

DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2021

DocketDescription: Time extended to grant or deny review; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including January 11, 2022, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/22/2021

DocketDescription: Reply to answer to petition filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Leonard Albrecht Attorney: Jane E. Maschka Plaintiff and Appellant: Patricia Abbey Attorney: Jane E. Maschka

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2021

DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: 1 doghouse.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2021

DocketDescription: Joinder to answer filed; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: County of Riverside Attorney: Ronak N. Patel Intervener and Respondent: Desert Water Agency Attorney: Miles B. Krieger Attorney: Roderick Walston Intervener and Respondent: Coachella Valley Water District Attorney: Michael G. Colantuono Attorney: Pamela K. Graham

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2021

DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Appellate record imported and available in electronic format.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2021

DocketDescription: Case start: Petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Leonard Albrecht Attorney: Jane E. Maschka Plaintiff and Appellant: Patricia Abbey Attorney: Jane E. Maschka

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2021

DocketDescription: Received premature petition for review; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Leonard Albrecht Attorney: Jane E. Maschka Plaintiff and Appellant: Patricia Abbey Attorney: Jane E. Maschka

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/13/2021

DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Fourth Appellate District, Division Two; Court of Appeal Case Number: E073926; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Riverside County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: PSC1501100; Trial Court: Riverside County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: RIC1719093

[+] Read More [-] Read Less