This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 07/23/2022 at 08:00:17 (UTC).

Alastor Group, Inc. v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Case Summary

On 06/08/2022 Alastor Group, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Bird, George. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0861

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Bird, George

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Alastor Group, Inc.

Respondent

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Interested Party

Jonathan Hanh

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Anthony A. Sears

Attorney at Anthony A. Sears Attorney At Law

846 West Foothill Blvd. Suite M-1

Upland, CA 91786-3784

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorney

Tiffany Dang Truong

Attorney at Kimball, Tirey & St. John, LLP

915 Wilshire Blvd, Site 1650

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record transmitted to Supreme Court electronically.; Notes: E-sent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.; Notes: S275223

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed June 8, 2022. The petition is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:; Notes: Petitioner, Alastor Group, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TRUONG TIFFANY DANG