This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/27/2020 at 01:29:50 (UTC).

Akribis Group, LLC et al. v. Johnson et al.

Case Summary

On 10/30/2018 Akribis Group, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Johnson. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Sixth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Stoelker, James. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6385

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Stoelker, James

 

Party Details

Respondents and Plaintiffs

Akribis Group, LLC

Nirmalya Bhowmick

Defendants and Appellants

Mark A. Johnson

Daly City Venue Management Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Dennis D. Brown

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Julius Harmond Hughey

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

12/04/2019

HearingDescription: Record preparation inquiry sent.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2019

DocketDescription: Record preparation inquiry sent.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2019

DocketDescription: Record preparation inquiry sent.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2018

DocketDescription: Received copy of; Notes: Clerk's certificate of compliance. Appellant was notified of a failure to comply on 11/19/18 and has now cured the default. Record preparation will now proceed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2018

DocketDescription: Filing fee received from:; Notes: Appellant

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/19/2018

DocketDescription: Received default notice 8.122(c) clerk's fees not deposited. Dated:; Notes: Filed 11/19/18.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/19/2018

DocketDescription: Appellant 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Filed 11/9/18. CT only.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/19/2018

DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2018

DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2018

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: NOA filed 10/30/18. By Atty. J. Harmond Hughey, for Mark A. Johnson and Daly City Venue Management Services, Inc.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2018

DocketTrial Court Name: Santa Clara County Superior Court; County: Santa Clara; Trial Court Case Number: CV292839; Trial Court Judge: Stoelker, James

[+] Read More [-] Read Less