This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 04/10/2022 at 15:04:20 (UTC).

Akal Security, Inc. v. Superior Court Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 09/29/2021 Akal Security, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Keosian, Gregory. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5358

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Keosian, Gregory

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Akal Security, Inc.

Respondents

Superior Court Los Angeles County

Hon. Gregory Keosian

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party

Satsunderta Khalsa

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

David Drew-Lyle Brandon

Attorney at Clark Hill LLP

1055 West Seventh Street 24Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Guillermo Marquez Tello

Attorney at Clark Hill LLP

1055 W. 7Th Street Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Claire Elizabeth Morton

Attorney at Clark Hill PLC

1055 West Seventh Street 24Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017-3357

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Scott H. Carr

Attorney at GREENE BROILLET & WHEELER LLP

100 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 2100

El Segundo, CA 90245

Aaron L. Osten

Attorney at Greene, Broillet & Wheeler, LLP

222 No. Pacific Coast Highway, Suite 210

El Segundo, CA 90245

Daniel Yehuda Zohar

Attorney at Zohar Law Firm, P.C.

1100 Glendon Ave. Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Mark T. Quigley

Attorney at Greene Broillet et al.

P. O. Box 955

El Segundo, CA 90245-2131

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed September 29, 2021. The petition is denied. The temporary stay issued October 1, 2021, is dissolved.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Stay order filed.; Notes: The court has completed its initial review of the petition for writ of mandate filed September 29, 2021. The request for a temporary stay of the October 4, 2021 deadline for petitioner to file a responsive pleading is granted. The stay shall expire upon resolution of the petition or further order of this court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Volumes 3 of 3.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate with a STAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AKAL SECURITY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OSTEN AARON L.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARR SCOTT H.