This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 06/07/2022 at 06:23:40 (UTC).

AIDS HEALTHCARE FOUNDATION v. CITY OF LOS ANGELES (RILEY REALTY)

Case Summary

On 12/10/2021 AIDS HEALTHCARE FOUNDATION filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES RILEY REALTY. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2179

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Petitioner

AIDS Healthcare Foundation

Defendants and Respondents

City of Los Angeles

Los Angeles City Counsel

Los Angeles Department of City Planning

Riley Realty LP

Respondent and Interested Party

Riley Realty LP

Not Yet Classified

California Building Industry Association

Building Industry Association of the Bay Area

California Business Properties Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Petitioner Attorneys

Jonathan Michael Eisenberg

Attorney at AIDS Healthcare Foundation

6255 West Sunset Boulevard, 21St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90028

Liza Michalina Brereton

Attorney at Aids Healthcare Foundation

6255 West Sunset Boulevard, 21St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90028

Thomas Myers

Attorney at AIDS HealthCare Fdn

6255 West Sunset Boulevard, #2100

Los Angeles, CA 90028

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Michael Nelson Feuer

Attorney at Office of the City Attorney

200 North Main Street 701 City Hall East

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Terry Patricia Kaufmann Macias

Attorney at Los Angeles City Attorney's Office

200 North Main Street 701 City Hall East

Los Angeles, CA 90012-4130

Sabrina Vansteenki Teller

Attorney at Remy Moose Manley LLP

555 Capitol Mall, Suite 800

Sacramento, CA 95814

John William Fox

Attorney at Office of the Los Angeles City Attorney

200 North Main Street, Room 701

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Liliana Michaele Rodriguez

Attorney at Office of the City Attorney

200 North Main Street, Rm 701 City Hall East

Los Angeles, CA 90012-4133

Nathan Owen George

Attorney at Remy Moose Manley, LLP

555 Capitol Mall, Suite 800

Sacramento, CA 95814

Ann Catherine Norian

Attorney at DLA PIPER LLP (US)

550 South Hope Street, Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Karen L. Hallock

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

550 South Hope Street, Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Kyndra Joy Casper

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP

550 South Hope Street Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Andrew James Brady

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

550 South Hope Street, Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3101

Respondent and Interested Party Attorneys

Ann Catherine Norian

Attorney at DLA PIPER LLP (US)

550 South Hope Street, Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Karen L. Hallock

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

550 South Hope Street, Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Kyndra Joy Casper

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP

550 South Hope Street Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Andrew James Brady

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

550 South Hope Street, Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3101

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Linda C. Klein

Attorney at Cox, Castle & Nicholson

50 California Street, Suite 3200

San Francisco, CA 94111

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: 1 file jacket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition and Pub. request(s) denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review & publication request(s) denied; Notes: The petition for review is denied. The request for an order directing publication of the opinion is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reply to answer to petition filed; Notes: Petitioner and Appellant: AIDS Healthcare Foundation Attorney: Jonathan Michael Eisenberg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: City of Los Angeles Attorney: Sabrina Vansteenki Teller Real Party in Interest and Respondent: Riley Realty LP Attorney: Ann Catherine Norian Defendant and Respondent: Los Angeles City Counsel Attorney: Sabrina Vansteenki Teller Defendant and Respondent: Los Angeles Department of City Planning Attorney: Sabrina Vansteenki Teller (JOINT ANSWER TO PETITION FOR REVIEW)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: One file jacket.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record was imported and is available in electronic format.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed (after initial pub/depublication request); Notes: Petitioner and Appellant: AIDS Healthcare Foundation Attorney: Jonathan Michael Eisenberg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for publication filed (initial case entry); Notes: Pub/Depublication Requestor: California Building Industry Association Attorney: Linda C. Klein Pub/Depublication Requestor: Building Industry Association of the Bay Area Attorney: Linda C. Klein Pub/Depublication Requestor: California Business Properties Association Attorney: Linda C. Klein

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 1; Court of Appeal Case Number: B313529; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: 21STCP00049

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Los Angeles Department of City Planning is a litigant

Latest cases where California Building Industry Association is a litigant

Latest cases where California Business Properties Association is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF LOS ANGELES is a litigant