This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/03/2023 at 22:02:17 (UTC).

Aguilar v. Nissan North America, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/08/2022 Aguilar filed an Other lawsuit against Nissan North America, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fruin, Jr., Richard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1733

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Fruin, Jr., Richard

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Maricela Aguilar

Defendant and Appellant

Nissan North America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

David N. Barry

Jennifer Dale Bennett

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Michael Caling Yu

Jane Minkyung Chung

Amir M. Nassihi

Catherine K. Fong

Andrew Lu-Young Chang

Nalani Lin Crisologo

Nicholas S. Maugeri, II

Michael Patrick Sweeney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Voluntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: Pursuant to appellant's request for dismissal of appeal filed February 14, 2023, the appeal filed July 8, 2022, is dismissed. The remittitur shall issue forthwith (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.244(c)(2).)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketDescription: Request for dismissal filed.; Notes: Appellant's request for dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed declaration of:; Notes: Declaration in support of Appellant's second application for extension of time to file brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Notice of appearance of Andrew L. Chang and Nalani L. Crisologo from Shook Hardy & Bacon, L.L.P. as counsel of record for defendant-appellant Nissan North America, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: The notice of election to proceed pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.124 has been received and assigned the above case number. Appellant did not serve and file a notice to prepare a reporter's transcript. The appendix and opening brief are due within 70 days from the filing of the notice of election with the trial court (California Rules of Court, rule 8.212(a)(1)(B)).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Proceeding by 8.124 - no reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated July 19, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Nissan North America, Inc. Attorney: Catherine K. Fong Attorney: Jane Minkyung Chung Attorney: Michael Caling Yu Attorney: Michael Patrick Sweeney Attorney: Nicholas S. Maugeri, II

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Nissan North America, Inc.Attorney: Catherine K. Fong Attorney: Jane Minkyung Chung Attorney: Michael Caling Yu Attorney: Michael Patrick Sweeney Attorney: Nicholas S. Maugeri, II

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Appellant (July 8, 2022 by Nissan North America, Inc. ) is in default for failure to file a Case Information Statement pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 8.100(g).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case information statement returned for correction.; Notes: Civil case information statement submitted on August 5, 2022 returned for failure to attach the appealed order. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.100(g)(1).). The order submitted with the civil case information statement is a tentative ruling and not a conformed copy of an appealable order/judgment.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case information statement returned for correction.; Notes: Civil case information statement submitted on July 27, 2022 returned for failure to attach the appealed order. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.100(g)(1).). The order submitted with the civil case information statement is a tentative ruling and not a conformed copy of an appealable order/judgment.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check #309593 for $775 (Janney & Janney Attorney Services)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on July 8, 2022 by Nissan North America, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 21STCV41178; Trial Court Judge: Fruin, Jr., Richard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less