This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/18/2023 at 02:10:37 (UTC).

Aguilar v. Nissan North America, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/08/2022 Aguilar filed an Other lawsuit against Nissan North America, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fruin, Jr., Richard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1733

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Fruin, Jr., Richard

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Maricela Aguilar

Defendant and Appellant

Nissan North America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Jennifer Dale Bennett

Attorney at Gupta Wessler PLLC

100 Pine Street Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

David N. Barry

Attorney at The Barry Law Firm

11845 W. Olympic Blvd. Ste 1270

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Amir M. Nassihi

Attorney at Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP

555 Mission Street, Suite 2300

San Francisco, CA 94105

Michael Caling Yu

Attorney at Sweeney APC

21515 Hawthorne Blvd Ste 640

Torrance, CA 90503-6534

Nicholas S. Maugeri, II

Attorney at Sweeney APC

21515 Hawthorne Blvd, Ste 640

Torrance, CA 90503

Jane Minkyung Chung

Attorney at Sweeney APC

21515 Hawthorne Blvd, Ste 640

Torrance, CA 90503

Michael Patrick Sweeney

Attorney at Sweeney APC

21515 Hawthorne Blvd, Ste 640

Torrance, CA 90503

Catherine K. Fong

Attorney at SWEENEY APC

21515 Hawthorne Blvd Ste 640

Torrance, CA 90503-6534

Andrew Lu-Young Chang

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon LLP

555 Mission St. Suite 2300

San Francisco, CA 94105

Nalani Lin Crisologo

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon L.L.P.

555 Mission St. Suite 2300

San Francisco, CA 94105

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2023
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Due on 02/14/2023 By 33 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Requested for 02/14/2023 By 33 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed declaration of:; Notes: Declaration in support of Appellant's second application for extension of time to file brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Notice of appearance of Andrew L. Chang and Nalani L. Crisologo from Shook Hardy & Bacon, L.L.P. as counsel of record for defendant-appellant Nissan North America, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Due on 01/12/2023 By 45 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Requested for 01/12/2023 By 45 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Respondent associating in Jennifer Bennett

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Due on 11/28/2022 By 33 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Due on 10/26/2022 By 30 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Proceeding by 8.124 - no reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated July 19, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Nissan North America, Inc. Attorney: Catherine K. Fong Attorney: Jane Minkyung Chung Attorney: Michael Caling Yu Attorney: Michael Patrick Sweeney Attorney: Nicholas S. Maugeri, II

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Due Date: 02/14/2023; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Nissan North America, Inc.Attorney: Amir M. Nassihi Attorney: Andrew Lu-Young Chang Attorney: Catherine K. Fong Attorney: Jane Minkyung Chung Attorney: Michael Caling Yu Attorney: Michael Patrick Sweeney Attorney: Nalani Lin Crisologo Attorney: Nicholas S. Maugeri, II

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Nissan North America, Inc.Attorney: Catherine K. Fong Attorney: Jane Minkyung Chung Attorney: Michael Caling Yu Attorney: Michael Patrick Sweeney Attorney: Nicholas S. Maugeri, II

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Appellant (July 8, 2022 by Nissan North America, Inc. ) is in default for failure to file a Case Information Statement pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 8.100(g).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case information statement returned for correction.; Notes: Civil case information statement submitted on August 5, 2022 returned for failure to attach the appealed order. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.100(g)(1).). The order submitted with the civil case information statement is a tentative ruling and not a conformed copy of an appealable order/judgment.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case information statement returned for correction.; Notes: Civil case information statement submitted on July 27, 2022 returned for failure to attach the appealed order. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.100(g)(1).). The order submitted with the civil case information statement is a tentative ruling and not a conformed copy of an appealable order/judgment.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check #309593 for $775 (Janney & Janney Attorney Services)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on July 8, 2022 by Nissan North America, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 21STCV41178; Trial Court Judge: Fruin, Jr., Richard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nissan North America Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHUNG JANE MINKYUNG

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NASSIHI AMIR M.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YU MICHAEL CALING