This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 09/19/2021 at 06:35:35 (UTC).

AGHAIAN v. MINASSIAN

Case Summary

On 02/09/2021 AGHAIAN filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against MINASSIAN. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7030

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Aida Galstain Norhadian

Seda Galstian Aghaian

Respondents and Defendants

Arthur Minassian

Glendale, CA 91203

Alice Minassian

Shahen Minassian

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

David Wesley Swift

Attorney at Kinsella Weitzman Iser Kump LLP

808 Wilshire Boulevard, Third Floor

Santa Monica, CA 90401-1889

Gregory John Aldisert

Attorney at Aldisert Law PC

5737 Kanan Road, Suite 633

Agoura Hills, CA 93101

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Arthur Minassian

Attorney at Glendale Mediation Center

100 North Brand Boulevard, Sixth Floor

Glendale, CA 91203

Roy G. Weatherup

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

633 West 5Th Street, Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Robert Craig Woodbury

Attorney at Attorney at Law

15545 Sherman Way, Unit 22

Van Nuys, CA 91406

Caroline E. Chan

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

633 West 5Th Street, Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Lee David Lubin

Attorney at Law Offices of Lee David Lubin

16133 Ventura Boulevard, Suite 1175

Encino, CA 91436

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Time extended to grant or deny review; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including May 10, 2021, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Appellate record imported and available in electronic format.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Alice Minassian Attorney: Caroline E. Chan Attorney: Robert Craig Woodbury Attorney: Roy G. Weatherup Defendant and Respondent: Shahen Minassian Attorney: Lee David Lubin Defendant and Respondent: Arthur Minassian Attorney: Arthur Minassian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 1; Court of Appeal Case Number: B300726; Disposition: Reversed in Full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: LC107510

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SWIFT DAVID WESLEY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALDISERT GREGORY JOHN