This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 11/01/2023 at 09:07:04 (UTC).

Agardi v. Superior Court for the City and County of San Francisco

Case Summary

On 02/08/2022 Agardi filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court for the City and County of San Francisco. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Schulman, Ethan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4485

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Schulman, Ethan

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Julianna Agardi

Respondent

Superior Court for the City and County of San Francisco

Interested Party

City & County of San Francisco

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Interested Party Attorney

Hunter W. Sims, III

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

07/19/2023

DocketDescription: Shipped to state retention center, box # / list #:; Notes: Entire file complete.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/24/2022

DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final The petition for writ of mandate is denied.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/24/2022

DocketDescription: Case complete.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/24/2022

DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The petition for writ of mandate is denied.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2022

DocketDescription: Order waiving filing fee.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2022

DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/03/2021

DocketTrial Court Name: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; County: San Francisco; Trial Court Case Number: CGC20588062; Trial Court Judge: Schulman, Ethan

[+] Read More [-] Read Less