This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/19/2020 at 06:13:26 (UTC).

Aflalo v. Placer Foreclosure, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/27/2018 Aflalo filed an Other lawsuit against Placer Foreclosure, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7012

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Solomon Aflalo

Defendant and Respondent

Placer Foreclosure, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Rickey Ivie

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Ryan Giotta Rupe

Don Willenburg

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

01/16/2019

DocketDescription: Case complete.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2019

DispositionDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court; Disposition Type: Final

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2019

DocketDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court.; Notes: Received 01/16/19.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2018

DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: Notification following a successful mediation.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2018

DocketDescription: Case ordered to mediation.; Notes: BUTZ; Acting P.J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2018

DocketDescription: Respondent's mediation statement filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2018

DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Respondent associating the firm of Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP as c-counsel of record.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/25/2018

DocketDescription: Appellant's mediation statement filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2018

DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2018

DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: CCIS rejected. No copy of judgment or order being appealed attached. Re-submit by 06/29/18.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2018

DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: and CAMS due: 06/14/18.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/07/2018

DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Appellant's paid. Receipt Number: R322988.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2018

DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: Returning check made payable to Clerk of the Court/Recorder/Sheriff/Marshall. Filing fee now due: 05/18/18

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2018

DocketDescription: Respondent notified re CAMS.; Notes: RMS due 10 days after AMS.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2018

DocketDescription: Letter to counsel advising of due date of Civil Case Information Statement.; Notes: CCIS and AMS due: 05/18/18

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/02/2018

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed in the trial court on 04/27/18. Conversion.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2018

DocketTrial Court Name: Placer County Superior Court - Main; County: Placer; Trial Court Case Number: SCV0039600

[+] Read More [-] Read Less