This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/30/2022 at 02:20:46 (UTC).

Affordable Housing Coalition of San Diego County v. City of San Diego et al.

Case Summary

On 09/15/2021 Affordable Housing Coalition of San Diego County filed an Other lawsuit against City of San Diego. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Taylor, Timothy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9458

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Taylor, Timothy

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Respondents and Appellants

Affordable Housing Coalition of San Diego County

City of San Diego

1037 4th Avenue, LLC

Appellant and Defendant

City of San Diego

Appellant and Interested Party

1037 4th Avenue, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Respondent and Appellant Attorneys

Cory Jay Briggs

Attorney at Briggs Law Corporation

99 East "C" Street, Suite 111

Upland, CA 91786

Nora Pasin

Attorney at Briggs Law Corporation

99 East "C" Street, Suite 111

Upland, CA 91786

Michael Travis Phelps

Attorney at Office of the City Attorney

1200 3Rd Ave., Ste. 1100

San Diego, CA 92101

Rebecca Reed

Attorney at Procopio, Cory, Hargreaves & Savitch LLP

525 B Street, Suite 2200

San Diego, CA 92101

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Michael Travis Phelps

Attorney at Office of the City Attorney

1200 3Rd Ave., Ste. 1100

San Diego, CA 92101

Appellant and Interested Party Attorney

Rebecca Reed

Attorney at Procopio, Cory, Hargreaves & Savitch LLP

525 B Street, Suite 2200

San Diego, CA 92101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Voluntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: Upon written request filed by appellants, the appeals filed on September 7, 2021 by 1037 4th Avenue, LLC, and the City of San Diego, and the appeal filed on September 15, 2021 by Affordable Housing Coalition of San Diego County are DISMISSED and the remittitur is ordered to issue immediately. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.244(c)(2).)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for dismissal filed.; Notes: Affordable Housing (Corrected)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT FILED***; Notes: Clerk's rule 8.124 and Reporter's

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for dismissal filed.; Notes: Affordable Housing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for dismissal filed.; Notes: City of SD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for dismissal filed.; Notes: 1037 4th Ave.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Transcript fees paid.

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: As to appellant 1037

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: Re: Affordable Housing Coalition of San Diego County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellate package sent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Cross-appeal filed 9/15/21 by Affordable Housing Coalition of San Diego County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exempt filing fee.; Notes: City of San Diego

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: Re: 1037 4th Avenue, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellate package sent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed on 9/7/21 by City of San Diego

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed on 9/7/21 by 1037 4th Avenue, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: 37-2019-00027875-CU-WM-CTL; Trial Court Judge: Taylor, Timothy

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Affordable Housing Coalition of San Diego County is a litigant

Latest cases where 1037 4th Avenue LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where City of San Diego is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Reed, Rebecca