This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/16/2023 at 04:10:23 (UTC).

A.E. v. The Superior Court; DPSS

Case Summary

On 01/23/2023 A E filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court DPSS. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cho, Susanne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0553

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Cho, Susanne

 

Party Details

Petitioner

A. E.

Respondent

The Superior Court of Riverside County

Interested Party

Riverside County Department of Public Social Services

Not Yet Classified

L. R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Kevin Kar Shek

Attorney at Juvenile Defense Panel

P.O. Box 5643

La Quinta, CA 92248-5643

Interested Party Attorney

Office of the County Counsel

3960 Orange St., Fifth Floor

Riverside, CA 92501-3674

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Angela J. Friedrichs

Attorney at Juvenile Defense Panel

82-675 Highway 111, Room 314

Indio, CA 92201

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Order dismissing petition; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: Pursuant to letter filed Feb 17, 2023, by counsel for petitioner A.E., petition is dismissed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: No Issue Statement Filed by Counsel; Notes: Dtd Feb 17, 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: Record was filed this date. Writ petition due w/in 10 days.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketDescription: Juvenile writ record filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1 (13 pgs)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: C-2 (524 pgs)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketDescription: Record returned to county for corrections.; Notes: Reporter's Transcript; Cover page had incorrect address for County Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Dtd Jan 27, 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Relief from default is granted. The superior court is directed to prepare and file the record on or before 12 days after date of this order.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: notice of intent, memorandum from ADI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed:; Notes: Memorandum from ADI w/notice of intent attached

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of; Notes: Minute order dtd Jan 13, 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received notice of intent.; Notes: dtd Jan 23, 2023; A.E. (Mother)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Riverside County Superior Court; County: Riverside; Trial Court Case Number: INJ2100344; Trial Court Judge: Cho, Susanne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less