This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/04/2021 at 18:26:27 (UTC).

ADSD Investments I, Inc. et al. v. Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Case Summary

On 08/01/2019 ADSD Investments I, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Baker Hostetler, LLP. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sanders, Glenda. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8225

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Sanders, Glenda

 

Party Details

Respondents and Plaintiffs

Adam DeVone

ADSD Investments I, Inc.

Defendant and Appellant

Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

John M. Pierce

Attorney at Pierce Bainbridge beck Price & Hecht LLP

355 S. Grand Avenue., 44Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Scott B. Garner

Attorney at Umberg/Zipser, LLP

1920 Main Street Suite 750

Irvine, CA 92614

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record shipped to records center; Notes: All documents scanned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DispositionDescription: Voluntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed pursuant to:; Notes: Appellant having filed a request for dismissal in this court, the appeal is DISMISSED. The remittitur shall issue forthwith. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.244(c)(2).)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketDescription: Request for dismissal filed.; Notes: By aplt.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: 1-RT (1-33 pages)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: J. Taylor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketDescription: Appellant 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Filed on: 08/29/19 Proceeding under rule 8.124 w/RT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: By aplt.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appellant: Baker & Hostetler LLP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Main; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2018-01029109; Trial Court Judge: Sanders, Glenda

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PENSION & BENEFIT INSURANCE SERVICES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Baker Hostetler, LLP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARNER SCOTT BRIAN