Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 01/11/2021 at 00:26:01 (UTC).

Adams et al. v. The Superior Court of Orange County

Case Summary

On 08/24/2020 Adams filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of Orange County. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Salter, Glenn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9361

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    California Courts Of Appeal

  • Courthouse:

    Fourth Appellate District - Division 3

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Salter, Glenn

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Trott USA

Bonnie Adams

Respondent

The Superior Court of Orange County

Attn: Hon. Glenn Salter Dept. C22 700 Civic Center Dr. W.

Santa Ana, CA 92701

Interested Party

Bria Hebert

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Michael Alan Preciado

Attorney at Buchalter

18400 Von Karman Ave Ste 800

Irvine, CA 92612-514

Gary Alan Wolensky

Attorney at Hewitt Wolensky LLP

18400 Von Karman Ave Ste 800

Irvine, CA 92612

Interested Party Attorney

Mohammed Ghods

Attorney at Lex Opus

2100 North Broadway, Suite 210

Santa Ana, CA 92706

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2020
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: Record shipped to records center; Notes: E-Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The petition for writ of mandate and request for immediate stay are DENIED. MOORE, ACTING P. J. * Before Moore, Acting P. J., Aronson, J., and Fybel, J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Amended Exibits in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Amended Writ Petition: Missing a Certificate of Interested Entities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $775 Paid.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Exhibits in support of petition for writ of mandate. PP.(985)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: By Petitoners Bonnie Adams and Trott USA. Petition for writ of mandate; Request for immediate stay ( Trial date Oct 05, 2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Superior Court of Orange County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GHODS, MOHAMMED K.