This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 11/25/2021 at 02:46:28 (UTC).

Adam Garcia v. The Superior Court; The People

Case Summary

On 10/06/2021 Adam Garcia filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court The People. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Strunsky, Burke. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7851

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Strunsky, Burke

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Adam Emmanuel Garcia

San Fernando, CA 91341

Respondent

The Superior Court of Riverside County

Interested Party

The People

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Interested Party Attorneys

Office of the District Attorney

3960 Orange Street

Riverside, CA 92501

Natalie Marie Lough

Attorney at Office of the District Attorney

3960 Orange Street

Riverside, CA 92501

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: 1 volume (155 pgs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: exhibits; petitioner only did two bookmarks so bookmarks are incomplete and pagination is incorrect cover page is page number 1 with exhibit list reflecting same page as the bookmarks.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed:; Notes: Addendum to petitioner's Reply

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: response by petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: 3 response's from petitioner; duplicates

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Response filed to:; Notes: petition, per order of Oct 19, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: 1 vol (51 pgs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Respondent and RPI are invited to file a response to the petition for writ of mandate/prohibition on file herein on or before Nov 9, 2021. Unless good cause is shown, the court may issue a peremptory writ in the first instance. The request for immediate stay is denied. The court reserves jurisdiction to stay the proceedings pending consideration of the merits of the petition. No further stay request need be filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: 1 vol

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: w/request for stay

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Superior Court of Riverside County is a litigant

Latest cases where People is a litigant