This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 11/24/2022 at 05:01:49 (UTC).

Activision Blizzard, Inc. et al. v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 06/30/2022 Activision Blizzard, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Dillon, Timothy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1267

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Dillon, Timothy

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Activision Blizzard, Inc.

Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.

Activision Publishing, Inc.

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Hon. Timothy P. Dillon

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party

Department of Fair Employment and Housing

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

David Halleck Fry

Attorney at Munger Tolles & Olson LLP

560 Mission St 27Fl

San Francisco, CA 94105

Laura Ashley Aull

Attorney at Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP,

350 S Grand Ave Fl 50

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Elena R. Baca

Attorney at Paul Hastings LLP

515 South Flower Street 25Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2228

Daniel Scott Carlton

Attorney at Paul, Hastings, Janofsky & Walker LLP

515 S Flower St 25Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Felicia Anne Davis

Attorney at Paul Hastings LLP

515 S Flower St 25Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Ryan David Derry

Attorney at Paul Hastings LLP

101 California St Fl 48

San Francisco, CA 94111-5871

Brad Dennis Brian

Attorney at Munger Tolles & Olson LLP

350 South Grand Avenue, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1560

Katherine Melanie Forster

Attorney at Munger Tolles & Olson LLP

350 S Grand Ave Fl 50

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1560

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Antonio Micheal Lawson

Attorney at Department of Fair Employment & Housing

2218 Kausen Dr, Ste 100

Elk Grove, CA 95758

Alexis Susann McKenna

Attorney at Dept of Fair Employment and Housing

2218 Kausen Dr, Ste 100

Elk Grove, CA 95758

Kendra Lee Tanacea

Attorney at Department of Fair Employment & Housing

2218 Kausen Dr, Ste 100

Elk Grove, CA 95758

Jahan Crawford Sagafi

Attorney at Outten & Golden LLP

1 California St, Fl 12

San Francisco, CA 94111

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: THE COURT: We have read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed June 29, 2022. The petition for writ of mandate is denied for failure to demonstrate entitlement to extraordinary relief. Panel: LAVIN, Acting P. J., EGERTON, J. and ADAMS, J.* * Judge of the Los Angeles Superior Court, assigned by the Chief Justice pursuant to article VI, section 6 of the California Constitution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Two volumes of exhibits.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate with STAY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Blizzard Entertainment Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where DEPARTMENT OF FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING is a litigant