This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 09/15/2021 at 22:25:17 (UTC).

ACSC Management Services, Inc. et al. v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Case Summary

On 06/16/2021 ACSC Management Services, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Beaudet, Teresa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3082

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Beaudet, Teresa

 

Party Details

Petitioners

ACSC Management Services, Inc.

Auto Club Enterprises

Respondent

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Interested Party

Blanca Gutierrez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Timothy M. Freudenberger

Attorney at CDF Labor Law, LLP

18300 Von Karman Avenue Suite 800

Irvine, CA 92612

Garrett V. Jensen

Attorney at CDF Labor Law LLP.

18300 Von Karman Ave Ste 800

Irvine, CA 92612

Brian Eric Cole, II

Attorney at CDF Labor Law, LLP

18300 Von Karman Ave Ste 800

Irvine, CA 92612-1037

Respondent Attorneys

Hon. Teresa Beaudet

Attorney at Dept. 50

Los Angeles Superior Court 111 N. Hill St., Dept. 1

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Natalie Rose Haritoonian

Attorney at David Yeremian & Associates Inc

535 N Brand Blvd Ste 705

Glendale, CA 91203

Sahag Majarian

Attorney at Law Offices of Sahag Majarian II

18350 Ventura Blvd

Tarzana, CA 91356

David Harmik Yeremian

Attorney at David Yeremian & Associates, Inc.

535 N Brand Boulevard Suite 705

Glendale, CA 91203

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The petition for writ of mandate filed on June 16, 2021, has been read and considered. The court denies petitioners' request to vacate the trial court's May 11, 2021 preliminary injunction order because petitioners failed to provide an adequate record or a declaration explaining the circumstances making the documents unavailable (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.486(b)), and a preliminary injunction is not an adjudication on the merits and does not affect the merits of the claim. (See, e.g., Novartis Vaccines & Diagnostics, Inc. v. Stop Huntingdon Animal Cruelty USA, Inc., (2006) 143 Cal. App. 4th 1284, 1302.) Petitioners' request to stay all trial court proceedings is denied without prejudice to filing the proper petition for writ of supersedeas in their appellate case Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.112.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Mandate, etc. - Vol 1 of 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate, Prohibition, Certiorari or Other Appropriate Relief

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AUTO CLUB ENTERPRISES GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where ACSC MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARITOONIAN NATALIE