This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 01/29/2023 at 10:05:40 (UTC).

ACCURSO v. IN-N-OUT BURGERS

Case Summary

On 06/22/2022 ACCURSO filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against IN-N-OUT BURGERS. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5185

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondents and Plaintiffs

Ryan Accurso

In-n-Out Burgers

Appellants

Brianna Marie Taylor

Tom Piplack

Respondent and Defendant

In-n-Out Burgers

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Jonathan Michael Lebe

Attorney at Lebe Law, A Professional Law Corporation

777 South Alameda Street Fl 2

Los Angeles, CA 90021-1657

Zachary Taylor Gershman

Attorney at Lebe Law APC

777 South Alameda Street, 2Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90021

Paul Scott Cowie

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, Floor 17

San Francisco, CA 94111

Appellant Attorneys

Sahag Majarian

Attorney at Law Offices of Sahag Majarian II

18250 Ventura Boulevard

Tarzana, CA 91356

Randall B. Aiman-Smith

Attorney at Aiman-Smith & Marcy

7677 Oakport Street, Suite 1150

Oakland, CA 94621

Vincent Charles Granberry

Attorney at Lavi & Ebrahimian, LLP

8889 West Olympic Boulevard, Suite 200

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Brent A. Robinson

Attorney at Aiman-Smith & March

7677 Oakport Street, Suite 1150

Oakland, CA 94621

Joseph Lavi

Attorney at Lavi & Ebrahimian, LLP

8889 West Olympic Boulevard Suite 200

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Jordan Domingo Bello

Attorney at Lavi & Ebrahimian, LLP

8889 West Olympic Boulevard, Suite 200

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Reed W. L. Marcy

Attorney at Aiman-Smith & Marcy

7677 Oakport Street Suite 1150

Oakland, CA 94621

Hallie VonRock

Attorney at Aiman-Smith & Marcy

7677 Oakport Street, Suite 1150

Oakland, CA 94621

Reed W. Marcy

Attorney at Aiman-Smith & Marcy

7677 Oakport Stree, Suite 1150

Oakland, CA 94621-1932

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

Paul Scott Cowie

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, Floor 17

San Francisco, CA 94111

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Application to transfer denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Application to transfer denied; Notes: The request for judicial notice is granted. The petition to transfer cause A165320, currently pending before the Court of Appeal, First Appellate District, Division Four, to this court for decision is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibit(s) lodged; Notes: Exhibits B to Request for Judicial Notice.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibit(s) lodged; Notes: Exhibit A to Request for Judicial Notice.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Request for Judicial Notice.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Motion for judicial notice filed; Notes: Non-Title Appellant: Brianna Marie Taylor Attorney: Brent A. Robinson Attorney: Jordan Domingo Bello Non-Title Appellant: Tom Piplack Attorney: Brent A. Robinson Attorney: Jordan Domingo Bello

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record was imported and is available in electronic format.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Application to transfer to Supreme Court; Notes: Non-Title Appellant: Brianna Marie Taylor Attorney: Brent A. Robinson Attorney: Jordan Domingo Bello Non-Title Appellant: Tom Piplack Attorney: Brent A. Robinson Attorney: Jordan Domingo Bello

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robinson, Brent Alan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hallie Linnay Von Rock

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BELLO JORDAN DOMINGO