This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 12/07/2022 at 02:10:43 (UTC).

Abney v. California Department of Health Care Services et al.

Case Summary

On 03/11/2022 Abney filed an Other lawsuit against California Department of Health Care Services. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Bolanos, Suzanne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4775

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Bolanos, Suzanne

 

Party Details

Appellant and Petitioner

Debra Abney

Respondents

California Department of Health Care Services

City and County of San Francisco

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Petitioner Attorneys

Michael Keys

Attorney at Bay Area Legal Aid

1035 Market Street - 6Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94103

David M. Kane

Attorney at Western Center on Law & Property

3701 Wilshire Blvd Suite 208

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Robert Dexter Newman, Jr

Attorney at Western Center On Law & Poverty

3701 Wilshire Boulevard - Suite 208

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Richard A. Rothschild

Attorney at Western Center On Law And Poverty

3701 Wilshire Boulevard - Suite 208

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Respondent Attorneys

Katherine J. Grainger

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Avenue Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102

Office of the Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Avenue - Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102-7004

Tara Michelle Steeley

Attorney at Office of City Attorney

1390 Market Street, Fourth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94102

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2023
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's reply brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • HearingDescription: To court.; Notes: Appellant's request for judicial notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: for AOB to trial judge/superior court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: David Kane and Michael Keys, counsel for appellant Dear Counsel, The appellant's opening brief was filed on November 30, 2022. Pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.212(c), a copy of each brief must be served on the trial judge. Currently, the TrueFiling proof of service does not electronically serve the superior court because we do not have permission to do so. Within 7 days from the date of this email, please submit a proof of service to said brief showing service on the trial judge. Imelda Santos Deputy Clerk - Division Two

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for judicial notice filed.; Notes: Appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: Files 14-21, Volume 2 of 2, pp. 445-656

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: Files 1-13, Volume 1 of 2, pp. 1-444

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Petitioner and Appellant: Debra Abney Attorney: David M. Kane One extension granted for a total of 63 days: 08/18/2022 Stipulation of extension of time filed to:. Due on 11/14/2022 By 63 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Petitioner and Appellant: Debra Abney Attorney: David M. Kane David Kane, attorney for appellant, w/copy of order attached

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Due Date: 05/17/2023; Party Attorney: Petitioner and Appellant: Debra AbneyAttorney: David M. Kane Attorney: Michael Keys Attorney: Richard A. Rothschild Attorney: Robert Dexter Newman, Jr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Due Date: 02/28/2023; Party Attorney: Respondent: City and County of San FranciscoAttorney: Tara Michelle Steeley

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Due Date: 02/28/2023; Party Attorney: Respondent: California Department of Health Care ServicesAttorney: Katherine J. Grainger Attorney: Office of the Attorney General

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Petitioner and Appellant: Debra AbneyAttorney: David M. Kane; Notes: David Kane, attorney for appellant, w/copy of order attached

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 3/21/22; 8.124 w RT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 03/11/2022 by Counsel for Petitioner Debra Abney appealing judgment from 02/10/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; County: San Francisco; Trial Court Case Number: CPF20517020; Trial Court Judge: Bolanos, Suzanne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where City and County of San Francisco is a litigant

Latest cases where California Department of Health Care Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Katherine J. Grainger

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tara Michelle Steeley