This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 10/13/2021 at 01:28:08 (UTC).

640 Tenth, LP et al. v. Newsom et al.

Case Summary

On 07/22/2021 640 Tenth, LP filed an Other lawsuit against Newsom. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Medel, Kenneth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9339

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Medel, Kenneth

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

640 Tenth, LP

O'Frank, LLC

Hansen Rammel Braun Corporation

Golden Egg Venture, Inc.

Fit Athletic Club-San Diego, LLC

Crossfit East Village Corporation

Defendants and Respondents

Gavin Newsom

Rob Bonta

Tomas J. Aragon

County of San Diego

Wilma J. Wooten

Sandra Shewry

Erica S. Pan

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Bruno William Katz

Attorney at Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker

401 West A Street, Suite 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

Andrew Yu-Chih

Attorney at Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker

401 West A Street, Suite 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

Daniel Christopher Oren

Attorney at Wilson Elser LLP

401 West A Street, Suite 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

Matthew Sean Harrison

Attorney at Prometheus Civic Law

65 Enterprise Ste 300

Aliso Viejo, CA 92656

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Alan D Romero

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

1300 I Street

Sacramento, CA 95814

Joshua Michael Heinlein

Attorney at Office of County Counsel

1600 Pacific Highway, Room 355

San Diego, CA 92101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2021
  • HearingDescription: APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Appellants' opposed second motion for calendar preference and expedited briefing schedule is DENIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: Respondents' opposition to appellants' second motion for calendar preference and expedited briefing schedule

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: RECORD ON APPEAL FILED.************; Notes: CT-3 (645 pages); RT-7 (223 pages)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Motion filed.; Notes: Appellants' second motion for calendar preference and expedited briefing schedule

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: The court has received the letter submitted by appellants on September 9, 2021, contending the appeal should be construed as being taken only from the July 2, 2021 judgment and that the denial of their petition for writ of mandate "is part of the final judgment entered by the Trial Court." The appeal may proceed. The parties may address the issue of appealability in their briefs.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Appellants' opposed motion for calendar preference and expedited briefing schedule is DENIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed:; Notes: Appellants' counsel declaration in response to respondents' response to motion for calendar preference and expedited briefing schedule

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: Respondents' opposition to appellants' motion for calendar preference and expedited briefing schedule

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Appellants re court's 9/3/21 letter

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received default notice 8.121(a) designation not filed. Dated:; Notes: 8/18/21 3rd NOA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received default notice 8.121(a) designation not filed. Dated:; Notes: 8/18/21 - 2nd NOA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 8/9/21 1st NOA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 7/29/21 - CT and RT (1st NOA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellate package sent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 7/22/21 by 640 Tenth LP - 3rd NOA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 7/19/21 by 640 Tenth LP - 2nd NOA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 6/28/21 by 640 Tenth, LP, etc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: 37-2020-00041316-CU-MC-CTL; Trial Court Judge: Medel, Kenneth

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Golden Egg Venture, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where O'Frank, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Fit Athletic Club-San Diego, LLC is a litigant