This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/15/2022 at 22:56:16 (UTC).

640 Octavia LLC v. Pieper et al.

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 640 Octavia LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Pieper. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4531

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

640 Octavia LLC

Appellants and Defendants

Kalle Karl-Heinz Pieper

Jose Montoya

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott Freedman

Attorney at Zacks, Freedman & Patterson P.C.

601 Montgomery Street, Suite 400

San Francisco, CA 94111

Justin A. Goodman

Attorney at Zacks & Freedman & Patterson, P.C.

601 Montgomery Street, Suite 400

San Francisco, CA 94111

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Yosef Peretz

Attorney at Peretz & Associates

22 Battery Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94111

David Garibaldi

Attorney at Peretz & Associates

22 Battery St Ste 200

San Francisco, CA 94102

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2022
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: to Appellant's 1st EOT for AOB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Due on 10/03/2022 By 31 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Requested for 10/03/2022 By 31 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: to stipulated EOT for AOB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Due on 09/02/2022 By 59 Day(s) AOB to 9-2-22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: R-1(e-filed) **Entire Record Electronic**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check # 4850, Peretz Associates

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: CSR R. Sharp for TX of 12-15-21, due 30 days from date of notice (dated 3/12/22)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Kalle Karl-Heinz Pieper Attorney: Yosef Peretz Yosef Peretz, attorney for appellants, w/copy of judgments attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Due Date: 10/03/2022; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Kalle Karl-Heinz PieperAttorney: David Garibaldi Attorney: Yosef Peretz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Kalle Karl-Heinz PieperAttorney: Yosef Peretz; Notes: Yosef Peretz, attorney for appellants, w/copy of judgments attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 02/22/2022. Designating 8.124 with RT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice received-appellant notified per rule 8.140(a)(1).; Notes: Default for RT fees (filed 2/25/22)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Missing judgment/order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Kalle Karl-Heinz Pieper Attorney: Yosef Peretz Defendant and Appellant: Jose Montoya Yosef Peretz, attorney for Appellants, WITHOUT copy of judgment/order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Kalle Karl-Heinz PieperAttorney: Yosef Peretz Defendant and Appellant: Jose Montoya; Notes: Yosef Peretz, attorney for Appellants, WITHOUT copy of judgment/order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 01/21/2022 by Counsel for Defendants Kalle Pieper and Jose Montoya appealing judgment from 12/29/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; County: San Francisco; Trial Court Case Number: CUD21667662

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 640 Octavia, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GIRIBALDI, DAVID

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PERETZ, YOSEF