This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/31/2021 at 03:21:54 (UTC).

3123 SMB LLC et al. v. Horn

Case Summary

On 11/30/2020 3123 SMB LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Horn. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 7 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sotelo, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9412

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Sotelo, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

3123 SMB LLC

Kling Corporation

Defendant and Respondent

Steven J. Horn

Encino, CA 91436-3095

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

Anthony N. Kling

Attorney at Kling Law Firm

P.O. Box 49165

Los Angeles, CA 90049

David M. Knieriem

Attorney at Attorney at Law

13321 North Outer Forty Rd. Suite 100

Town & Country, MO 63017

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Wendy Leigh Wilcox

Attorney at Skane Wilcox, LLP.

1055 West 7Th Street Suite 2850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Steven Jeffry Horn

Attorney at Law Offices of Steven J. Horn

15760 Ventura Blvd. Suite 1520

Encino, CA 91436-3095

Jonathan Jeremy Belaga

Attorney at Skane Wilcox

1055 W 7Th St. Suite 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2021
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: Respondent's brief. Due on 07/06/2021 By 64 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: 3123 SMB LLC Attorney: Anthony N. Kling Plaintiff and Appellant: Kling Corporation Attorney: Anthony N. Kling Two extensions granted for a total of 51 days: 01/28/2021 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 03/09/2021 By 28 Day(s) 02/03/2021 Granted - extension of time. Due on 03/09/2021 By 28 Day(s) 03/04/2021 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 04/01/2021 By 23 Day(s) 03/04/2021 Granted - extension of time. Due on 04/01/2021 By 23 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Due Date: 07/06/2021; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: Steven J. HornAttorney: Jonathan Jeremy Belaga Attorney: Steven Jeffry Horn Attorney: Wendy Leigh Wilcox

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: 3123 SMB LLCAttorney: Anthony N. Kling Plaintiff and Appellant: Kling CorporationAttorney: Anthony N. Kling; Notes: Two extensions granted for a total of 51 days: 01/28/2021 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 03/09/2021 By 28 Day(s) 02/03/2021 Granted - extension of time. Due on 03/09/2021 By 28 Day(s) 03/04/2021 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 04/01/2021 By 23 Day(s) 03/04/2021 Granted - extension of time. Due on 04/01/2021 By 23 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered respondent's February 5, 2021 motion to consolidate appeals B305967, B309412, and B310164 and appellants' opposition thereto filed February 5, 2021. Good cause appearing therefor, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the court may consider appeals B305967, B309412, and B310164 concurrently for purposes of oral argument and decision. Current briefing sequences for each appeal shall remain in place. The motion to consolidate appeals is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Responsive filing fee paid by Wendy Wolcox.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Response filed:; Notes: Appellant's response to respondent's motion for cosolidation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed declaration of:; Notes: Declaration of David Knieriem in support of application for admission pro hac vice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: pro hac vice application; Notes: Appellant's motion and motion to grant admission pro hac vice of David Knieriem

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: 3123 SMB LLC Attorney: Anthony N. Kling Plaintiff and Appellant: Kling Corporation Attorney: Anthony N. Kling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: 3123 SMB LLCAttorney: Anthony N. Kling Plaintiff and Appellant: Kling CorporationAttorney: Anthony N. Kling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $775.00 Filing Fee Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: Pro Hac Vice Attorneys This Court has received appellant's notice of appeal. The case has been assigned the above referenced number. Any counsel who are not licensed to practice in the State of California and intend to appear in or file any documents with this Court must first file an application to appear pro hac vice pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 9.40(c)(2). This application must be made to this Court regardless of any previous order granting pro hac vice appearance filed in the trial court. A new application to appear as counsel pro hac vice made to this Court must conform to California Rules of Court, Rule 8.54. Pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 9.40(e), payment of the required fee is to be made to California State Bar and a statement regarding payment must be indicated in the application to this Court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: appellant's notice filed in trial court on 12/1/2020, election to use appendix with RT (to be lodged with Court of Appeal)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: no fee received

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed 11/30/2020 by 3123 SMB, LLC, et al. ("U")

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC682318; Trial Court Judge: Sotelo, David

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 3123 SMB is a litigant

Latest cases where KLING CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan Jeremy Belaga

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HORN STEVEN J.