This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/23/2020 at 03:01:40 (UTC).

2H Construction, Inc. v. 801 South Grand Ave. (LA), LLC.

Case Summary

On 07/24/2019 2H Construction, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against 801 South Grand Ave LA , LLC. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 7 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Court, Michelle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9380

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Court, Michelle

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

2H Construction, Inc.

Respondent and Defendant

801 South Grand Ave. (LA), LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Chad Michael Wilson

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

Bernard M. Resser

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketDescription: Change of address filed for:; Notes: New address for Greenberg Glusker Fields Claman & Machtinger LLP: 2049 Centruy Park East Suite 2600 Los Angeles, California 90067 T: 310.553.3610 F: 310.553.0687 E: bresser@ggfirm.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DispositionDescription: Voluntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: Order re reversal of judgment and remand of action to the superior court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketDescription: Motion filed.; Notes: Joint application and stipulation for reversal of judgment and remand of action to the superior court for dismissal with prejudice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-4 (759 Pages)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketDescription: Augmentation granted. (See order.)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Proposed order to motion to augment.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated 8/6/19 Rule 8.122, clerk's & rep's trans

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketDescription: Motion/application to augment record filed.; Notes: Appellant's unopposed motion to augment record on appeal with documents attached.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: 2H Construction, Inc. Attorney: Chad Michael Wilson 2H Construction, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: 2H Construction, Inc.Attorney: Chad Michael Wilson; Notes: 2H Construction, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check# 102535 / 102536 for $775

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2019
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: July 24, 2019: 2H Construction, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC647138; Trial Court Judge: Court, Michelle

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less