This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 11/05/2021 at 02:39:22 (UTC).

2020 BALLCAMP v. S.C. (TRADER JOE'S)

Case Summary

On 04/23/2021 2020 BALLCAMP filed an Other lawsuit against C TRADER JOE'S. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8392

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

2020 Ballcamp, LLC.

Angelo Paparella

Respondent

Superior Court of San Diego County

1100 Union Street

San Diego, CA 92101

Interested Party

Trader Joe's Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Jon Ali Atabek

Attorney at Atabek & Associates, P.C.

16330 Bake Parkway

Irvine, CA 92618-4667

Christian Stephen Molnar

Attorney at Arendsen Cane Molnar, LLP

315 South Beverly Drive, Suite 320

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Interested Party Attorneys

Jennifer E. Laser

11777 San Vicente Boulevard, Suite 890

Los Angeles, CA 90049

Jennifer Laser

Attorney at Valle Makoff LLP

11777 San Vicente Boulevard, Suite 890

Los Angeles, CA 90049

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition and Stay denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review & application for stay denied; Notes: The petition for review and application for stay are denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Real Party in Interest: Trader Joe's Company Attorney: Jennifer Laser

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record was imported and is available in electronic format.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review with request for stay filed; Notes: Petitioner: 2020 Ballcamp, LLC. Attorney: Jon Ali Atabek Petitioner: Angelo Paparella Attorney: Jon Ali Atabek (Filed With Permission)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Petition for Review with Request for Stay(Timely; to be resubmitted with amended cover page, amended proof of service, and filing fee.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Fourth Appellate District, Division One; Court of Appeal Case Number: D078774; Disposition: Petition summarily denied by order; Trial Court: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: 37-2020-00032535-CU-OR-CTL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Superior Court of San Diego County is a litigant

Latest cases where TRADER JOE'S COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LASER, JENNIFER