Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 04/21/2021 at 05:47:26 (UTC).

11 LAGUNITA v. CALIFORNIA COASTAL COMMISSION

Case Summary

On 01/27/2021 11 LAGUNITA filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against CALIFORNIA COASTAL COMMISSION. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6872

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • Court:

    California Supreme Court

  • Courthouse:

    California Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

Tracy Katz

Jeffrey Katz

11 Lagunita, LLC

California Coastal Commission

Defendant and Appellant

California Coastal Commission

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

Stephanie N. Clark

Attorney at Nossaman LLP

18101 Von Karman Avenue, Suite 1800

Irvine, CA 92612

John J. Flynn

Attorney at Nossaman LLP

18101 Von Karman Avenue Suite 1800

Irvine, CA 92612-0177

Steven H. Kaufmann

Attorney at Nossaman LLP

777 South Figueroa Street, 34Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92612

Dimitri Daniel Portnoi

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP

400 South Hope Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Dimitri Portnoi

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers, LLP

400 South Hope Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Dimitri D. Portnoi

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers, LLP

400 South Hope Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Jamee Jordan Patterson

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

600 West Broadway, Suite 1800 P. O. Box 85266

San Diego, CA 92186

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Jamee Jordan Patterson

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

600 West Broadway, Suite 1800 P. O. Box 85266

San Diego, CA 92186

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reply to answer to petition filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: 11 Lagunita, LLC Attorney: Dimitri D. Portnoi Attorney: John J. Flynn Plaintiff and Appellant: Jeffrey Katz Attorney: Dimitri Daniel Portnoi Attorney: John J. Flynn Plaintiff and Appellant: Tracy Katz Attorney: Dimitri Daniel Portnoi Attorney: John J. Flynn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: California Coastal Commission Attorney: Jamee Jordan Patterson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Appellate record imported and available in electronic format.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: 11 Lagunita, LLC Attorney: Dimitri D. Portnoi Attorney: John J. Flynn Plaintiff and Appellant: Jeffrey Katz Attorney: Dimitri Daniel Portnoi Attorney: John J. Flynn Plaintiff and Appellant: Tracy Katz Attorney: Dimitri Daniel Portnoi Attorney: John J. Flynn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Fourth Appellate District, Division Three; Court of Appeal Case Number: G058436; Disposition: Affirmed in part and reversed in part; Trial Court: Orange County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2018-01013545

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA COASTALCOMMISSION is a litigant