This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 11/17/2022 at 02:00:36 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. TYLER JAMES WILSON

Case Summary

On 08/09/2016 The People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against TYLER JAMES WILSON. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Cortez, Rodney A, Swift, Bert L, Ortiz, Joseph T, Faherty, Shannon L and Rodney A Cortez. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1825

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Cortez, Rodney A

Swift, Bert L

Ortiz, Joseph T

Faherty, Shannon L

Rodney A Cortez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendants

WILSON, TYLER JAMES

WILSON, TYLER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Conflict Panel

Attorney at Conflict Panel

 

Court Documents

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingType: Surrender on Stay: Serve 10 days.; Department: Department M1 - Joshua Tree; Judge: Faherty, Shannon L; Result: Held; Court Reporter: Masih, Rowena

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketFile Type: Defendant remanded into custody

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingType: Hearing on Revocation of Probation; Department: Department M1 - Joshua Tree; Judge: Faherty, Shannon L; Result: Held; Court Reporter: Masih, Rowena

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingType: Requested Arraignment On Bench Warrant For Violation Of Prob: Current warrant $50,000 FTA on 8/1/19; Department: Department M3 - Joshua Tree; Judge: Swift, Bert L; Result: Held; Court Reporter: Electronically, Recorded

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketFile Type: Conflict Panel Notified

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketFile Type: Advisement of Rights filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketFile Type: District Attorney Notified

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketFile Type: Defendant called requesting information on case; Comments: status of case and request hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingType: Hearing on Revocation of Probation: Trailing MMB18001164; Department: Department M1 - Joshua Tree; Judge: Ortiz, Joseph T; Result: Failed to Appear; Court Reporter: Masih, Rowena

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketFile Type: Defendant called requesting information on case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketFile Type: Defense Counsel Concurred in Defendants Plea or Admission

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketFile Type: Defendant Waived Right to Confront And Cross Examine Witness

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketFile Type: Court Found Plea Was Knowledgeable, Intelligently Made,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketFile Type: Defendant Requests Payment Plan (+$35.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketFile Type: Defendant Waived Privilege Against Compulsory Self-Incrimina

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • DocketFile Type: Defendant called requesting information on case; Comments: INTENDS TO WALK IN AND ADDRESS WARRANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingType: Arraignment; Department: Department M2 - Joshua Tree; Judge: Swift, Bert L; Result: Failed to Appear; Court Reporter: Fata, Numia

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • DocketFile Type: eFiling - Initial Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • ChargeCOUNT: 2; RESULT: CHARGE; DETAILS: Misdemeanor - PC647(F)-M: Drunk In Public; JURISDICTION: County; Disposition; Date: 8/15/2018; Description: Dismissal/Stricken - Pursuant to Plea

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • ChargeCOUNT: 001; RESULT: CHARGE; DETAILS: Misdemeanor - PC21810-M: Possessess Any Metal Knuckles; JURISDICTION: Yucca Valley; Plea; Description: Guilty; Plea Date: 8/15/2018; Disposition; Date: 8/15/2018; Description: Convicted - Plea; Sentence; Sentence Date: 8/15/2018; Description: Misdemeanor Probation; Probation; Type: Summary Probation (Court); Start Date: 08/15/2018; Years: 3 Years; End Date: 08/14/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant