This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 11/17/2022 at 01:54:40 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Terry Ann Williams

Case Summary

On 08/08/2016 The People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Terry Ann Williams. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Swift, Bert L, Raphael, Tony, Cortez, Rodney A, Agron, Joel, Ortiz, Joseph T, Widman, Joseph B, Slater, Susan F and Bert L Swift. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1707

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Swift, Bert L

Raphael, Tony

Cortez, Rodney A

Agron, Joel

Ortiz, Joseph T

Widman, Joseph B

Slater, Susan F

Bert L Swift

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendants

Williams, Terry Ann

TERRY A WILLIAMS

TERRY AN WILLIAMS

WILLIAMS, TERRY A

WILLIAMS, TERRY AN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Public Defender

 

Court Documents

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Total; Charges: $305.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $15.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Credit; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $15.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Fees Removed Per AB177 Legislation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2020
  • DocketFile Type: Show Proof; Comments: of Completion Child Abuse Prevention Program (52 weeks)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketFile Type: CLETS Validation Certification completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • HearingType: Hearing on Revocation of Probation; Department: Department V2 - Victorville; Judge: Raphael, Tony; Result: Cancelled - Vacated; Court Reporter: Fata, Numia

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingType: Hearing on Revocation of Probation: Matter to trail FVI19000774; Department: Department V10 - Victorville; Judge: Widman, Joseph B; Result: Held; Court Reporter: Cordova, Jordan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketFile Type: Release Issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingType: Hearing on Revocation of Probation; Department: Videos - Victorville; Judge: Slater, Susan F; Result: Held; Court Reporter: Guillen, Sara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketFile Type: Public Defender Notified

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingType: Arraignment; Department: Department M1 - Joshua Tree; Judge: Swift, Bert L; Result: Failed to Appear; Court Reporter: Fata, Numia

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • DocketFile Type: 853.6 PC Felony/Misdemeanor Cite Release Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingType: Requested Arraignment On Bench Warrant; Department: Department M2 - Joshua Tree; Judge: Swift, Bert L; Result: Failed to Appear; Court Reporter: Fata, Numia

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • DocketFile Type: Request To Calendar Case In-Person

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingType: Requested Arraignment On Bench Warrant; Department: Department M2 - Joshua Tree; Judge: Swift, Bert L; Result: Failed to Appear; Court Reporter: Fata, Numia

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingType: Arraignment; Department: Department M1 - Joshua Tree; Judge: Swift, Bert L; Result: Failed to Appear; Court Reporter: Fata, Numia

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • DocketFile Type: Request To Calendar Case In-Person

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • DocketFile Type: eFiling - Initial Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • ChargeCOUNT: 2; RESULT: CHARGE; DETAILS: Misdemeanor - HS11364-M: Possess Controlled Substance - Paraphernalia; JURISDICTION: County; Plea; Description: Guilty; Plea Date: 5/22/2018; Disposition; Date: 5/22/2018; Description: Convicted - Plea; Sentence; Sentence Date: 5/22/2018; Description: Misdemeanor Probation; Confinement and Detention; Adult Confinement Type: County Jail; Term Type: Eligible for County Jail Weekend/ Work Release program; Term Days: 180 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 28 Days; Balance to be served at credit rate of: PC 4019 (1/2); Probation; Type: Summary Probation (Court); Start Date: 05/22/2018; End Date: 05/21/2022; Programs; Type: Attend/Complete a Child Abuse Prevention Program (52 weeks).; Order Date: 05/22/2018; Enroll by Date: 08/01/2018; Complete By: 08/01/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • ChargeCOUNT: 001; RESULT: CHARGE; DETAILS: Misdemeanor - PC273A(B)-M: Willful Cruelty To Child; JURISDICTION: 29 Palms; Plea; Description: Guilty; Plea Date: 5/22/2018; Disposition; Date: 5/22/2018; Description: Convicted - Plea; Sentence; Sentence Date: 5/22/2018; Description: Misdemeanor Probation; Confinement and Detention; Adult Confinement Type: County Jail; Term Type: Eligible for County Jail Weekend/ Work Release program; Term Days: 180 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 28 Days; Balance to be served at credit rate of: PC 4019 (1/2); Probation; Type: Summary Probation (Court); Start Date: 05/22/2018; End Date: 05/21/2022; Programs; Type: Attend/Complete a Child Abuse Prevention Program (52 weeks).; Order Date: 05/22/2018; Enroll by Date: 08/01/2018; Complete By: 08/01/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant