This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/16/2022 at 13:40:20 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Silvestre Martinez, Jr.

Case Summary

On 05/05/2021 The People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Silvestre Martinez, Jr. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gilbert, Ronald J, Powell, William Jefferson, IV, Arreola, Rafael, Tavill, Gregory S, Ronald M Christianson and Mazurek, J. David. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1769

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Gilbert, Ronald J

Powell, William Jefferson, IV

Arreola, Rafael

Tavill, Gregory S

Ronald M Christianson

Mazurek, J. David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendants

Martinez Jr., Silvestre

GORETTA

JUNIOR

KORA

ROBERT HOLGUIN

SILVERSTRE MARTINEZ

SILVESTER MARTINEZ

SILVESTRE MARTINEZ

SILVESTRE MARTINEZ JR

SYLVESTER MARTINEZ SANCHEZ

SYLVESTER SANCHEZ MARTINEZ

SYLVESTER VICTOR MARTINEZ

SYLVESTER VICTOR SANCHEZ

SYLVESTRE MARTINEZ JR

TACO

VICTOR MARTINEZ

VICTOR SANCHEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Public Defender

 

Court Documents

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingType: Trial Readiness: Jury Trial set for 7/6/2021; Department: Department S11 - SBJC; Judge: Mazurek, J. David; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Tahl Waiver filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Conviction Certified By Clerk of the Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Defendant Waived Right to Trial by Jury

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Revenue Recovery notified

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Defense Counsel Concurred in Defendants Plea or Admission

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Defendant Waived Right to Confront And Cross Examine Witness

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Court Found Plea Was Knowledgeable, Intelligently Made,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Plea Bargain Agreement Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Defendant advised of Charges and Direct Consequences of Plea

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Sesslin Affidavit filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Defendant Arraigned on Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketFile Type: eFiling - Initial Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Bail Setting

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Confidential Document Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketFile Type: 10th Day:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketFile Type: eFiling - Initial Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketFile Type: 30th day is:; Comments: Court Days, per Chief Justice order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketFile Type: 60th day is:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • ChargeCOUNT: 001; RESULT: CHARGE; DETAILS: Misdemeanor - HS11377-M: Possession-Amphetamines; JURISDICTION: San Bernardino; Plea; Description: No Contest; Plea Date: 7/2/2021; Disposition; Date: 7/2/2021; Description: Convicted - Plea; Sentence; Sentence Date: 7/2/2021; Description: Misdemeanor Probation; Probation; Type: Summary Probation (Court); Start Date: 07/02/2021; End Date: 07/01/2022; Confinement and Detention; Adult Confinement Type: County Jail; Term Type: Straight Sentence; Term Days: 120 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 61 Days; Balance to be served at credit rate of: PC 4019 (1/2)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JUNIOR is a litigant

Latest cases where Taco, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant