This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 02/22/2022 at 21:52:21 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. RICARDO MADRIGAL

Case Summary

On 11/02/2021 The People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against RICARDO MADRIGAL. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Benner, Arthur, II and Uhler, Ingrid A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8526

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Benner, Arthur, II

Uhler, Ingrid A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendant

Madrigal, Ricardo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Serrao, John-Paul Anthony

 

Court Documents

**Portal Minute Order

01/27/2022: **Portal Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketPretrial; Judicial Officer: Benner, Arthur, II; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Uhler, Ingrid A; Charges; Charge Number: 001; VC23152(A)-M: Driving Under the Influence; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; VC23152(B)-M: Driving Under the Influence Alcohol/0.08 Percent or More; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketDistrict Attorney Notified

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketGeneral time waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketAttorney for Defendant Waives Arraign./Rights (Comp./Cit.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Uhler, Ingrid A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketConfidential Document Filed; Comment: discovery scanned 12/6/21 *per DA use letter date*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketLetter re: Amendment to Complaint Filed; Comment: 01/27/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketeFiling - Initial Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • ChargeCharges: MADRIGAL, RICARDO; Charge #: 002; Description: VC23152(B)-M: Driving Under the Influence Alcohol/0.08 Percent or More; Statute: 23152(B); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • ChargeCharges: MADRIGAL, RICARDO; Charge #: 001; Description: VC23152(A)-M: Driving Under the Influence; Statute: 23152(A); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SERRAO, JOHN-PAUL