This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 12/21/2021 at 17:06:43 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. MICHAEL DAVID CZARNECKI

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 The People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MICHAEL DAVID CZARNECKI. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ferguson, Jon, Uhler, Ingrid A and Camber, Michael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9659

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ferguson, Jon

Uhler, Ingrid A

Camber, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendants

Czarnecki, Michael David

Mike Czarnecki

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Serrao, John-Paul Anthony

 

Court Documents

**Portal Minute Order

12/06/2021: **Portal Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketPretrial; Judicial Officer: Camber, Michael; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: GTW defense to file conflict waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Uhler, Ingrid A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Ferguson, Jon; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC597B(B)-M: Aiding/Abetting a Cockfight; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; PC597C-M: Unlawful Presence/Fighting Animals; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 004; PC597J(A)-M: Possession of Bird/Animal for fighting; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketDistrict Attorney Notified

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketGeneral time waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketAttorney for Defendant Waives Arraign./Rights (Comp./Cit.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequested Arraignment; Judicial Officer: Uhler, Ingrid A; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketConfidential Document Filed; Comment: discovery scanned 11/29/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketLetter re: Amendment to Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketeFiling - Initial Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • ChargeCharges: CZARNECKI, MICHAEL DAVID; Charge #: 004; Description: PC597J(A)-M: Possession of Bird/Animal for fighting; Statute: 597J(A); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • ChargeCharges: CZARNECKI, MICHAEL DAVID; Charge #: 002; Description: PC597C-M: Unlawful Presence/Fighting Animals; Statute: 597C; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • ChargeCharges: CZARNECKI, MICHAEL DAVID; Charge #: 001; Description: PC597B(B)-M: Aiding/Abetting a Cockfight; Statute: 597B(B); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SERRAO, JOHN-PAUL